United States of America v. Halo Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Halo Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02306
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #5 Unopposed Motion for 60-day Extension of Time to Answer. Halo Investments, LLC answer due 3/6/2023. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/17/2023. (M,S)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for 60-day extension of time until 03/06/2023 to answer, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Glen, Julia)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Halo Investments, LLC on 12/23/2022, filed on behalf of United States of America (Related document(s) #2 ) (Glen, Julia)
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 First Amended complaint against Halo Investments, LLC. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Aug. 2017 Default Judgment), #2 Summons) (Seitz, Lee)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Halo Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Halo Investments, LLC.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Aug. 2017 Default Judgment), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Seitz, Lee)
December 22, 2022 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (H,Ch)
December 22, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Halo Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julia M. Glen
Represented By: Lee Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halo Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?