Seiter v. DePuy International Limited et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Seiter
Defendant: DePuy International Limited, DePuy, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2022dp20015
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick(MDL2197)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne Seiter. DePuy International Limited waiver sent on 6/20/2022, answer due 9/19/2022 filed on behalf of Wayne Seiter (Morris, James)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne Seiter. Johnson & Johnson International waiver sent on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 filed on behalf of Wayne Seiter (Morris, James)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne Seiter. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 filed on behalf of Wayne Seiter (Morris, James)
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne Seiter. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 filed on behalf of Wayne Seiter (Morris, James)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11466964. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:10-md-2197. Filed by Wayne Seiter. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Morris, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seiter v. DePuy International Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Seiter
Represented By: James A. Morris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?