Huff v. Medina Farmers Exchange Company, et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Huff
Defendant: The Medina Farmers Exchange Company, James Allen Duffy, Cornerstone Innovations, Inc. doing business as Diversified Employee Solutions and Medina Farmers Exchange Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00287
Filed: February 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2023 Filing 11 Reply in support of #7 Motion to dismiss filed by James Allen Duffy, Medina Farmers Exchange Company. (Mills, Laura)
April 3, 2023 Filing 10 Opposition to #7 Motion to dismiss filed by Rebecca Huff. (Tayeh, Ziad)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #9 Motion for extension of time until 4/3/2023 to file response/reply to Defendants' #7 Motion to dismiss. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/29/2023.(R,Sh)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until 4/3/2023 to file response/reply to #7 Motion to dismiss with memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Huff. Related document(s) #7 . (Tayeh, Ziad)
March 24, 2023 Filing 8 State court documents received from Medina County Court of Common Pleas, case number 23CIV0056. Certified record returned to the Clerk of Courts for the Medina County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 letter to Medina County Clerk of Courts). (H,Ch)
March 13, 2023 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss with memorandum in support filed by James Allen Duffy, Medina Farmers Exchange Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Wage Detail, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of James Duffy)(Mills, Laura)
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by James Allen Duffy, Medina Farmers Exchange Company. (Mills, Laura)
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cornerstone Innovations, Inc. (Hepp, Richard)
February 21, 2023 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Cornerstone Innovations, Inc.. (Hepp, Richard)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #3 Motion for extension of time until March 13, 2023 to answer. James Allen Duffy answer due 3/13/2023; Medina Farmers Exchange Company answer due 3/13/2023. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/21/2023.(R,Sh)
February 20, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until March 13, 2023 to answer filed by James Allen Duffy, Medina Farmers Exchange Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Mills, Laura)
February 14, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (H,Ch)
February 14, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Medina County Court of Common Pleas, case number 23CIV0056 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11841037. Filed by James Allen Duffy, Medina Farmers Exchange Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Docket Sheet). (Mills, Laura)
February 14, 2023 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (H,Ch)
February 14, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff v. Medina Farmers Exchange Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Huff
Represented By: Ziad K. Tayeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medina Farmers Exchange Company
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Represented By: Pierce C. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Allen Duffy
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Represented By: Pierce C. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Innovations, Inc. doing business as Diversified Employee Solutions
Represented By: Richard E. Hepp
Represented By: W. Eric Baisden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medina Farmers Exchange Company
Represented By: Pierce C. Walker
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?