Williams v. Hung et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Williams
Defendant: Michelle Hung, Harry Williamson and Brian Bardwell
Case Number: 1:2023cv00295
Filed: February 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. (Related document(s) #24 ) (H,SP)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Memorandum Opinion and Order. The Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF #[7)] is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF #18 ) is denied. This action is REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas for Cuyahoga County, Ohio. The Parties shall bear their own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/5/2023. (M,S)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of #24 Memorandum Opinion and Order, mailed to Harry Williamson 1900 West 36th Street Lorain, OH 44053 on 4/5/2023. Related document(s) #24 . (M,S)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Reply in support of #18 Motion to strike Memorandum in Support of Reply filed by Brian Bardwell. (Latchney, John)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Case Management Conference held on 3/22/2023. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 12/1/2023. Fully briefed Motion to Remand. Court to rule. Next Status Conference to be determined. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 20 minutes. (M,S)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of #22 Minutes of Case Management Conference, mailed to Harry Williamson 1900 West 36th Street Lorain, OH 44053 on 3/23/2023. Related document(s) #22 . (M,S)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to excuse appearance of Plaintiff at 3/22/2023 Case Management Conference (Related Doc #21 ). Only attendance of counsel is required. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/20/2023. (M,S)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion to excuse appearance, mailed to Harry Williamson 1900 West 36th Street Lorain, OH 44053 on 3/20/2023. (M,S)
March 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to excuse appearance filed by Plaintiff Thomas Williams. (Novak, William)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Opposition to #18 Motion to strike Memorandum in Support of Reply filed by Thomas Williams. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 14 - Docket Sheet 1:23cv295) (Novak, William)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Acknowledgment of receipt of original state court record received on 2/28/2023 from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #3 . (Mc,K)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to strike Memorandum in Support to Reply, with memorandum in support filed by Defendant Brian Bardwell. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Latchney, John)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Reply in support of #7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Thomas Williams. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Novak, William)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Opposition to #7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Brian Bardwell, Harry Williamson. (Latchney, John)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by Michelle Hung. (Smith, David)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by David M. Smith and Joseph C. Pokorny filed on behalf of Michelle Hung. (Smith, David)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Marginal Entry Order denying Defendant's #11 Motion for a 60 day extension of time to obtain counsel for representation and answer and respond to complaint. Case Management Conference to proceed on 3/22/2023 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/2/2023. (M,S)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Opposition to #11 Motion for extension of time until 60 days to answer filed by Thomas Williams. (Novak, William)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of #13 Order on Motion, mailed to Harry Williamson 1900 West 36th Street Lorain, OH 44053 on 3/2/2023. Related document(s) #13 . (M,S)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for a 60 day extension of time to obtain counsel for representation and answer and respond to complaint filed by Defendant Harry Williamson. (Mc,K)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time until such time as the court rules on the motion to remand to file response/reply to #6 Motion to strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/28/2023. (H,Ch)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 3/22/2023 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/28/2023. (M,S)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of #9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Harry Williamson 1900 West 36th Street Lorain, OH 44053 on 2/28/2023. Related document(s) #9 . (M,S)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of #10 Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion, mailed to Harry Williamson 1900 West 36th Street Lorain, OH 44053 on 2/28/2023. Related document(s) #10 . (H,Ch)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion for extension of time until Until such time as the court rules on the motion to remand to file response/reply to #6 Motion to strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas Williams. Related document(s) #6 . (Novak, William)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Thomas Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint 1:21cv1863, #4 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, Lorain County Court case 22-cv-205156, #5 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, Cuyahoga County Court case CV22-971623, #6 Exhibit 4 - Docket sheet case 1:21cv1863, #7 Exhibit 5 - Docket sheet case CV22-971623, #8 Exhibit 6 - Journal Entry of 12/28/22 case CV22-971623, #9 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiff's Second Motion for Protective Order and Request for Sanctions case CV22-971623, #10 Exhibit 8 - Journal Entry of 12/12/22 case CV22-971623, #11 Exhibit 9 - Journal Entry of 1/30/23 case CV22-971623, #12 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Appeal CV22-971623, #13 Exhibit 11 - Motion to Dismiss CV22-971623, #14 Exhibit 12- Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Exhibit 13 - Legal Fee Bill) (Novak, William)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to strike #4 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Brian Bardwell. (Latchney, John) Modified to link to Amended Notice of Removal on 2/27/2023 (F,AW).
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Brian Bardwell. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendant Bardwell's Answer filed 1-6-23)(Latchney, John)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Amended Notice of Removal to United States District Court filed by Harry Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record) Related document(s) #1 . (Mc,K)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 State court documents received from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 22 971623. Original record returned to Cuyahoga County Court with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Cuyahoga County Court, #2 Envelope) (Mc,K)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,AP)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 22 971623 with jury demand. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt #143716. Filed by Harry Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint) (R,AP)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (R,AP)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (R,AP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Williams
Represented By: William J. Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Hung
Represented By: David M. Smith
Represented By: Joseph C. Pokorny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bardwell
Represented By: Frank G. Mazgaj
Represented By: John D. Latchney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?