Bobak v. Safety Controls Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tadeusz Bobak
Defendant: Safety Controls Technology, Inc., SCT Holdco, LLC, Scaleco Management, LLC, Scaleco Management IV, LLC, SCT Operations, Inc., Scaleco IV SCT Investors, LLC, SCT Blocker, Inc., Joseph D Ventura, Gail Grueser and Joseph D. Ventura
Case Number: 1:2023cv01450
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' unopposed #11 Motion for Extension of Time until 10/2/2023 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge David A. Ruiz on 9/22/2023. (H,Z)
September 21, 2023 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until October 2, 2023 to answer , move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SCT Blocker, Inc., SCT Holdco, LLC, SCT Operations, Inc., Scaleco IV SCT Investors, LLC, Scaleco Management IV, LLC, Scaleco Management, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Consolo, Frank)
August 18, 2023 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Anthony D. Dick filed by on behalf of Gail Grueser, Safety Controls Technology, Inc., Joseph D. Ventura. Related document(s) #1 .(Dick, Anthony)
August 18, 2023 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Robert E. Dezort filed by on behalf of Gail Grueser, Safety Controls Technology, Inc., Joseph D. Ventura. Related document(s) #1 .(Dezort, Robert)
August 18, 2023 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tadeusz Bobak. Joseph D. Ventura waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023 filed on behalf of Tadeusz Bobak (Mayell, Casey)
August 18, 2023 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tadeusz Bobak. Safety Controls Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023 filed on behalf of Tadeusz Bobak (Mayell, Casey)
August 18, 2023 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tadeusz Bobak. Gail Grueser waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023 filed on behalf of Tadeusz Bobak (Mayell, Casey)
August 16, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tadeusz Bobak. Scaleco IV SCT Investors, LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023; Scaleco Management IV, LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023; Scaleco Management, LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023 filed on behalf of Tadeusz Bobak (Mayell, Casey)
August 16, 2023 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tadeusz Bobak. SCT Blocker, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023; SCT Holdco, LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023; SCT Operations, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/24/2023 filed on behalf of Tadeusz Bobak (Mayell, Casey)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Frank Consolo filed by on behalf of SCT Blocker, Inc., SCT Holdco, LLC, SCT Operations, Inc., Scaleco IV SCT Investors, LLC, Scaleco Management IV, LLC, Scaleco Management, LLC. Related document(s) #1 .(Consolo, Frank)
July 26, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided and not issued. (R,AP)
July 26, 2023 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (R,AP)
July 26, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (R,AP)
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand Tadeusz Bobak against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12102716. Filed by Tadeusz Bobak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Notice of Right to Sue) (Mayell, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobak v. Safety Controls Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tadeusz Bobak
Represented By: Casey D. Mayell
Represented By: Peter G. Friedmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Controls Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony D. Dick
Represented By: Robert E. Dezort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCT Holdco, LLC
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scaleco Management, LLC
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scaleco Management IV, LLC
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCT Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scaleco IV SCT Investors, LLC
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCT Blocker, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Grueser
Represented By: Anthony D. Dick
Represented By: Robert E. Dezort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Ventura
Represented By: Anthony D. Dick
Represented By: Robert E. Dezort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?