Wolf v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Terrie Wolf
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2023cv01652
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Referring Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 7 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #1 . (Golden, Dennis)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,KL)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 8/28/2023. (S,KL)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 8/28/2023. (S,KL)
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (H,Ch)
August 25, 2023 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (H,Ch)
August 25, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (H,Ch)
August 25, 2023 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (H,Ch)
August 25, 2023 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/25/2023. (H,Ch)
August 24, 2023 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Terrie Wolf. (Wilson, Rachel)
August 24, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Terrie Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Wolf
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Dennis A. Golden
Represented By: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?