Moorer v. U.S. National Bank
Plaintiff: Antoinette Moorer
Defendant: U.S. National Bank
Case Number: 1:2023cv01757
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Contract Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Nicholas D. O'Conner filed by on behalf of U.S. National Bank. (O'Conner, Nicholas)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. National Bank filed by U.S. National Bank. (Gerlach, Kyle)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy filed by U.S. National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerlach, Kyle)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Kyle R. Gerlach filed by on behalf of U.S. National Bank. (Gerlach, Kyle)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon U.S. National Bank on 10/16/2023, filed on behalf of Antoinette Moorer. Related document(s) #5 . (M,CE)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons, Complaint, and supplements addressed to U.S. National Bank placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #9590 9402 7673 2122 7216 55. (M,CE)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Supplement to #1 Complaint, Affidavit, filed by Antoinette Moorer. Related document(s) #1 . (M,CE)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Complaint, Affidavit of Truth, filed by Antoinette Moorer. Related document(s) #1 . (M,CE)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Original Summons issued over the counter to pro se Plaintiff for service upon U.S. National Bank. (R,AP)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Antoinette Moorer. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. National Bank) (R,AP)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Financial Transaction in the amount of $402.00 received from Antoinette Moorer. Receipt #148006. Related document(s) #1 . (R,AP)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint,, filed by Antoinette Moorer. Related document(s) #1 . (L,Br)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Antoinette Moorer. Related document(s) #1 . (F,AW)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint against U.S. National Bank. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Antoinette Moorer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Bank Statement, #2 Exhibit B-US Bank Acknowledgement Letter, #3 Exhibit C-Mortgage Information, #4 Exhibit D-US Bank Acknowledgement Letter, #5 Exhibit E-US Bank Correspondence, #6 Exhibit F-Authorization Acknowledgement, #7 Exhibit G-Purchase Ready Buyer Certificate, #8 Exhibit H-Claim of Credits 1st Notice, #9 Exhibit I-Conditional Acceptance Letter, #10 Exhibit J-Default Notice, #11 Exhibit K-Correspondence from Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (F,AW)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (F,AW)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moorer v. U.S. National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Moorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. National Bank
Represented By: Kyle R. Gerlach
Represented By: Nicholas D. O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?