Smith v. Liscoe et al.
Plaintiff: Michelle Smith
Defendant: Andrew Liscoe and Bretzyl Liscoe
Case Number: 1:2023cv02426
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures Served Upon Plaintiff on 2.14.24 filed by Andrew Liscoe. Related document(s) #10 .(Spellacy, Leo)
February 14, 2024 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Michelle Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(Dillon, Rosalind)
February 6, 2024 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures filed by Bretzyl Liscoe. (Brunn, Jr., Thomas)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/21/2024 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Judge David A. Ruiz. Conferencing instructions to be emailed to counsel. Lead counsel and parties must participate unless excused by the Court upon written motion. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. Judge David A. Ruiz on 1/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting) (G,CA)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Thomas R. Kayes for Michelle Smith. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 1/19/2024. (G,CA)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Andrew Liscoe. (Spellacy, Leo)
January 17, 2024 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Bretzyl Liscoe. (Brunn, Jr., Thomas)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Thomas R. Kayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee paid, $120.00. Receipt number 149689. Filed by Plaintiff Michelle Smith. Document was not hand signed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Supreme Court of Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Supreme Court of California Certificate of Good Standing) (R,AP)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Bretzyl Liscoe on 12/27/2023, filed on behalf of Michelle Smith (Related document(s) #2 ) (Dillon, Rosalind)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Andrew Liscoe on 12/27/2023, filed on behalf of Michelle Smith (Related document(s) #2 ) (Dillon, Rosalind)
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Andrew Liscoe, Bretzyl Liscoe. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch)
December 22, 2023 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (H,Ch)
December 22, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12328436. Filed by Michelle Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on Andrew Liscoe, #3 Summons on Bretzyl Liscoe) (Dillon, Rosalind)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Liscoe et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Smith
Represented By: Rosalind E. Dillon
Represented By: Thomas R. Kayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Liscoe
Represented By: Leo M. Spellacy, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel T. O'Leary
Represented By: Todd C. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bretzyl Liscoe
Represented By: Alison D. Ramsey
Represented By: Thomas L. Brunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?