Tronsen v. Toledo-Lucas County Public Library Featured Case

A library patron's suspension for six months from accessing the library was reasonable when plaintiff disrupted a female library patron's right to quiet enjoyment by handing her an offensive note.

Plaintiff: Anders Tronsen
Defendant: Toledo-Lucas County Public Library
Case Number: 3:2008cv00148
Filed: January 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Lucas
Presiding Judge: James G. Carr
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2008 Filing 47 True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The Notice of Appeal 43 is dismissed for want of prosecution. The proper fee was not paid by 11/17/08 (USCA# 08-3977). Date issued by USCA 11/24/08 (H, SP)
October 17, 2008 Filing 46 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied re 43 . Tronsen is directed to pay the $455 appellate fee with the District Court within 30 days of the date of this order (USCA# 08-3977). Date issued by USCA 10/17/08 (H, SP)
August 18, 2008 Filing 45 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of 43 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 08-3977). Date filed in USCA 8/13/08. (H, SP)
July 16, 2008 Filing 44 Motion to appeal in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen (related document 43 ). (M,C)
July 15, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 6th Circuit Court of Appeals from the 41 Order and 42 Judgment Entry of 6/30/08, filed by Anders Tronsen. No filing fee paid (M,C). Modified text on 7/17/2008 (H, SP).
June 30, 2008 Filing 42 Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the Order filed 6/30/08, ordered that Plaintiffs motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, file an affidavit and file a restatement of the case are granted. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted. Plaintiff's motions for leave to amend his complaint and refile for a temporary restraining order and for summary judgment are denied. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith and should not be allowed without prepayment of the requisite appellate filing fee.. Judge James G. Carr on 6/30/2008. (S,AL)
June 30, 2008 Filing 41 Order : Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, file an affidavit and file a restatement of the case are granted. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted. Plaintiff's motions for leave to amend his complaint and refile for a temporary restraining order and for summary judgment are denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith and should not be allowed without prepayment of the requisite appellate filing fee. (Related Doc # 34 )(Related Doc # 35 )(Related Doc # 39 )(Related Doc # 40 )(Related Doc # 9 )(Related Doc # 30 )(Related Doc # 3 ). Judge James G. Carr on 6/30/2008.(S,AL)
June 9, 2008 Filing 40 Motion for summary judgment and memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,D)
June 5, 2008 Filing 39 Motion for leave to file affidavit-declaration of pertinent and relative facts of matter filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (Attachments: # 1 proposed supplementary restatement, # 2 proposed affidavit)(G,D) Modified on 6/9/2008 to correct filed date (G,D).
May 31, 2008 Filing 38 Reply Brief and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John) Modified on 6/3/2008 (B,TM).
May 29, 2008 Filing 37 Opposition to 30 Motion for leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John)
May 27, 2008 Filing 36 Order: Leave granted to plaintiff to file two (2) documents [Doc. 31] and to appraise court of additional cases [Doc. 33]; leave granted to defendant to file opposition to plaintiffs motion for leave to amend his complaint [Doc. 32]; plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint shall be decisional on filing by defendant of opposition; defendant's reply to its motion for summary judgment, due 6/2/08, shall also include its response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; leave granted to plaintiff to file a reply in support of his motion for summary judgment by 6/16/08; and no further pleadings allowed, except on order issued sua sponte by the undersigned, by either party pending adjudication of motions for summary judgment. (Related Doc # 31 ); (Related Doc # 32 ); (Related Doc # 33 ). Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 5/27/08. (S,JM)
May 22, 2008 Filing 35 Motion for leave to file a restatement of case filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,Di)
May 19, 2008 Filing 34 Motion for leave to re-file for restraining order-injunction against defendant or for expedited resolution of this matter, with supporting memoranda filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,D)
May 1, 2008 Filing 33 Motion for leave to appraise court of previously unmentioned cases filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,D) Modified on 6/9/2008 (L,V). Leave granted 5/27/08; no attachment to file.
April 29, 2008 Filing 32 Motion for leave to file Memorandum in Opposition filed by Defendant Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. Related document(s) 30 . (Borell, John)
April 25, 2008 Filing 31 Motion for leave to file 2 documents filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Planned Absence, # 2 Memorandum Supporting and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Certificate of Service)(G,D)
April 21, 2008 Filing 30 Motion for leave to amend complaint filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,Di)
April 21, 2008 Filing 29 Opposition Memorandum to 9 Motion for summary judgment filed by Anders Tronsen. (G,Di)
April 14, 2008 Filing 28 Order : Plaintiff's motions numbered 12, 14, 15, 17, 22 and 26 are denied. Defendant's motion to strike [Doc. 11] is denied. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment by May 15, 2008; defendant's reply to be filed by June 1, 2008. Further proceedings as to all other matters held in abeyance pending adjudication of defendant's motion for summary judgment; no pleadings shall be filed by either party without express prior leave of court allowing such filing; any pleading submitted for filing without prior court approval shall, pending further court order, not be accepted for filing. (Related Doc # 11 )(Related Doc # 12 (Related Doc # 14 )(Related Doc # 15 ) 16 (Related Doc # 17 )(Related Doc # 22 )(Related Doc # 26 ). Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 4/14/2008.(S,AL)
April 12, 2008 Filing 27 Reply Brief to 15 Motion for temporary restraining order and injunction filed by Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John) Modified on 4/15/2008 (B,TM).
April 1, 2008 Filing 26 Motion to suppress and sever judicial functions filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,D)
March 27, 2008 Filing 25 Notice of Service of Brief, Motion for Federal Reconsideration and Addendum to Motion Request for Appointment of Counsel filed by Anders Tronsen. Related document(s) 24 , 23 , 22 .(G,D)
March 27, 2008 Filing 24 Brief filed by Anders Tronsen. (G,D)
March 27, 2008 Filing 23 Addendum to 17 Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Anders Tronsen. Related document(s) 17 . (G,D)
March 27, 2008 Filing 22 Motion for Federal Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,D)
March 24, 2008 Filing 21 Opposition to 17 Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John)
March 21, 2008 Filing 20 Notice of Service of addendum memorandum, opposition to time extension and request for appointment of counsel filed by Anders Tronsen. Related document(s) 17 , 19 , 18 .(G,D)
March 21, 2008 Filing 19 Addendum to Memorandum to Motion for review of prior case 14 for filed by Anders Tronsen. Related document(s) 14 . (G,D)
March 21, 2008 Filing 18 Opposition to 16 Motion for extension of Response to Pending Motions until April 15, 2008 filed by Anders Tronsen. (G,D)
March 21, 2008 Filing 17 Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,D) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2008: # 1 Main Document) (G,D). Regenerated NEF with correct document attached.(G,D).
March 19, 2008 Filing 16 Motion for extension of Response to Pending Motions until April 15, 2008 filed by Defendant Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John)
March 19, 2008 Filing 15 Motion for restraining order or for injunction filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,Di)
March 13, 2008 Filing 14 Motion for review of prior case of Tronsen v. Toledo-Lucas County Library, et al filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Notice of Service)(G,D)
March 8, 2008 Filing 13 Opposition to 12 Motion for reconsideration filed by Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John)
March 7, 2008 Filing 12 Motion for reconsideration of Order filed 2/26/08. filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. Related document(s) 8 . (G,D)
March 5, 2008 Filing 11 Motion to strike filed by Defendant Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. Related document(s) 10 . (Borell, John)
February 28, 2008 Filing 10 Brief supporting permanent injunction filed by Anders Tronsen. (G,D)
February 26, 2008 Filing 9 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John)
February 26, 2008 Filing 8 Order : plaintiff's 'Writ of Prejudice', being deemed a motion for recusal, is denied. Further, Plaintiff's motion for extension of time is denied. 6 . Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 2/26/2008.(S,AL)
February 18, 2008 Filing 7 Opposition to 6 Motion for extension of time until 3/30/08 to file brief in support of case and to Writ of Prejudice filed by Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Borell, John)
February 15, 2008 Filing 6 Writ of Prejudice AND Motion for extension of time until 3/30/08 to file brief in support of case filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (G,Di)
January 22, 2008 Filing 5 Order : Motion for temporary restraining order denied. Leave granted to plaintiff to submit brief in support of motion for preliminary injunction on or before February 15, 2008; defendant's response to be filed by February 29, 2008; plaintiffs reply to be filed by April 1, 2008. Leave granted to defendant to file dispositive motion on or before February 29, 2008; plaintiffs opposition to be filed on or before April 1, 2008; defendants reply to be filed by April 15, 2008. Further proceedings held in abeyance pending adjudication of motion for preliminary injunction and defendants dispositive motion. (Related Doc # 2 ) Signed by Judge James G. Carr on 1/22/2008.(S,AL) Modified on 1/24/2008 (B,TM).
January 18, 2008 Filing 4 Opposition to 2 Motion for (TRO) filed by Toledo-Lucas County Public Library. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeff Sabo, # 2 Exhibit to Sabo affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Defendant's Code of Conduct)(Borell, John) Modified on 1/24/2008 (B,TM).
January 17, 2008 Filing 3 Motion (Application) to proceed without prepayment of fees filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (A,P)
January 17, 2008 Filing 2 Motion for immediate injunctive relief filed by Plaintiff Anders Tronsen. (A,P)
January 17, 2008 Filing 1 Complaint against Toledo-Lucas County Public Library filed by Anders Tronsen. (No filing fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 U.S. Marshal Form) (A,P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tronsen v. Toledo-Lucas County Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anders Tronsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toledo-Lucas County Public Library
Represented By: Karlene D. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?