Buccina et al v. Grimsby
Plaintiff: Nancy Buccina and Scot A Buccina
Defendant: Linda Ann Grimsby
Case Number: 3:2014cv02434
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Lucas
Presiding Judge: James G. Carr
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Order: On review of plaintiffs' motion for new trial, I conclude the jury lacked a legally sufficient evidentiary basis for its verdict in favor of defendant. It is, therefore, ORDERED THAT: plaintiffs motion for a new trial (Doc. 129) be, and the same hereby is, granted. The Clerk shall forthwith schedule a telephone scheduling conference. Judge James G. Carr on 6/6/2017.(C,D)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order: Defendant's motion for a setoff (Doc. 93 ) be, and the same hereby is,granted. Judge James G. Carr on 9/22/16.(C,D)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order: The trial date is vacated, and all further proceedings in this case are stayed pending the Sixth Circuit's disposition of this request for interlocutory review. The parties shall submit a status report within two weeks after either the Court of Appeals' order declining interlocutory review or its decision on the merits. Judge James G. Carr on 2/10/16. (C,D)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order. While the general Maritime Law governs this case, there was, as a matter of law, no collision for purposes of the Inland Navigation Rules;Any statement or suggestion to the contrary in Buccina v. Grimsby, 2016 WL 246048, *2 (N.D. Ohio), be, and the same hereby is abrogated; and the Clerk shall schedule a status conference for Wednesday, February 10, 2016, for the purpose of determining whether I should certify this case, and my ruling that no collision occurred in this case, for interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b).. Judge James G. Carr on 2/8/2016. (G,D)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude Application of Robinson v. Bates be, and the same hereby is, denied.(Related Doc # 49 ). Judge James G. Carr on 1/27/16.(C,D)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Rebuttal Witness (Doc. 39 ), be, and the same hereby is granted. Defendant's Motion to Limit the Testimony of Neil Schechter, etc. (Doc. 44 ) be, and the same hereby is denied. Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of John Deck III. (Doc. 46 ) be, and the same hereby is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Marie Roy (Doc. 47 ) be, and the same hereby is denied. Judge James G. Carr on 1/21/16. (C,D)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order. Defendant's Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 26 ) denied. Judge James G. Carr on 1/6/2016.(G,D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buccina et al v. Grimsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Buccina
Represented By: Christopher D. Kuebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scot A Buccina
Represented By: Christopher D. Kuebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ann Grimsby
Represented By: Brian T. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?