Wheeler v. United States of America
Plaintiff: James Lee Wheeler
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv00366
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: David A. Katz
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Memorandum of Opinion and Order accepting Plaintiff's objections as timely filed and vacating the February 16, 2016 Judgment 43 . The court hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (re 42 ) in its entirety, ov errules Plaintiff's Objections 44 and 46 , grants Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27) and denies both Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF 32) and Defendant's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 35) as moot. The court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this decision cannot be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 1/18/2017. (D,M)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION & JUDGMENT Adopting Report and Recommendation. Defendant's motion to dismiss granted 27 . Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 32 and Defendant's motion to strike 35 denied as moot. Judge David A. Katz on 2/16/16. (G,C)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLOSED TRANSFER - The Court finds that the gain in convenience to the defendants outweighs the loss of convenience to Wheeler, and that the transfer is in the interest of justice. Accordingly, the defendant's motion to transfer [dkt. 15] is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) the above action is now TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio. **SEE ORDER** Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/24/2015. (AH) [Transferred from insd on 2/26/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lee Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Represented By: Debra G. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?