Nofziger v. Huntington Bancshares Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Nofziger and Lynne Nofziger
Defendant: Southwest Business Corporation, Wayne Mutual Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Huntington National Bank and Huntington Bancshares Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2015cv00646
Filed: April 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice; each party to bear its own costs and expenses. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/14/2015. (S,AL)
September 11, 2015 Filing 38 Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Huntington National Bank. (Turnbull, Tracey)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order: the parties having indicated that this case is settled, ordered that a dismissal entry shall be filed within sixty days. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/28/2015. (S,AL)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Order (non-document): Case management conference set for 7/9/2015 at 10:00 am is vacated, pending adjudication of motion to dismiss. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/26/2015. (SG,D)
June 25, 2015 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement In A Civil Case filed by Huntington National Bank. (Turnbull, Tracey) Modified on 6/25/2015 (M,M).
June 24, 2015 Filing 35 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Swain v. Wells Fargo Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lyons v. Litton Loan Servicing Complaint)(Turnbull, Tracey)
June 24, 2015 Filing 34 Answer to #24 Amended complaint, filed by American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Southwest Business Corporation answer due 7/23/2015. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/24/2015.(SG,D)
June 23, 2015 Filing 32 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Andrew Soukup for Defendant Huntington National Bank. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #28 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/23/2015.(SG,D)
June 23, 2015 Filing 31 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Keith A. Noreika for Defendant Huntington National Bank. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #27 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/23/2015.(SG,D)
June 22, 2015 Filing 30 Proposed Order Granting #29 Unopposed Motion of Defendant Southwest Business Corporation for an Extension of Time until July 23, 2015 to file a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Southwest Business Corporation. Related document(s) #29 . (Hudson, David) Modified text on 6/23/2015 (H,JD).
June 22, 2015 Filing 29 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 23, 2015 to answer filed by Defendant Southwest Business Corporation. (Hudson, David) Modified text on 6/23/2015 (H,JD).
June 22, 2015 Filing 28 Motion for attorney Andrew Soukup to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7149228, filed by Defendant Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Turnbull, Tracey)
June 22, 2015 Filing 27 Motion for attorney Keith Noreika to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7149186, filed by Defendant Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Turnbull, Tracey)
June 15, 2015 Filing 26 Marginal Entry Order granting defendant's Motion for leave to exceed the page limitation. (Related Doc #25 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/15/2015.(S,AL)
June 12, 2015 Filing 25 Motion for leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Defendant Huntington National Bank. (Turnbull, Tracey)
June 10, 2015 Filing 24 First Amended complaint against American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Huntington National Bank, Southwest Business Corporation. Filed by Lynne Nofziger, Jeffrey Nofziger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Letter 7.21.2010, #4 Exhibit Letter 5.20.2011, #5 Exhibit Letter 3.26.2012) (Giles, Brian)
June 9, 2015 Filing 23 Notice of case management conference to be held on 7/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (S,AL)
June 9, 2015 Filing 22 Marginal Entry Order granting plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint. re #19 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/8/2015. (S,AL)
June 8, 2015 Filing 21 FILING ERROR, refiled as #22 . Marginal Entry Order granting plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint. (Related Doc #19 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/8/2015.(S,AL) Modified on 6/9/2015 to note refiling (H,JD).
June 8, 2015 Filing 20 Marginal Entry Order granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Huntington Bancshares Incorporated answer due 6/12/2015. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/8/2015.(S,AL)
June 3, 2015 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion to amend complaint filed by Jeffrey Nofziger, Lynne Nofziger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Giles, Brian)
May 29, 2015 Filing 18 Motion for extension of time until June 12, 2015 to answer complaint filed by Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, Huntington National Bank. (Turnbull, Tracey)
May 21, 2015 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Andrew J. Dorman filed by on behalf of Southwest Business Corporation. (Dorman, Andrew)
May 21, 2015 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by David R. Hudson filed by on behalf of Southwest Business Corporation. (Hudson, David)
May 15, 2015 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal as to defendant Wayne Mutual Insurance. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/29/2015. (S,AL)
April 27, 2015 Filing 13 Marginal Entry Order granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Huntington Bancshares Incorporated and Huntington National Bank answer due 5/29/2015. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/27/2015.(SG,D)
April 27, 2015 Filing 12 Notice of Dismissal under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Defendant Wayne Mutual Insurance filed by all Plaintiffs. (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 4/28/2015 (H,JD).
April 24, 2015 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until May 29, 2015 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, Huntington National Bank. (Turnbull, Tracey)
April 23, 2015 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Tracey L. Turnbull Robert W. Trafford and James D. Curphey filed by on behalf of Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, Huntington National Bank. (Turnbull, Tracey)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting #8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant American Modern Insurance Group, Inc. answer due 5/15/2015. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/20/2015.(SG,D)
April 16, 2015 Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for extension of time of fifteen days to answer to Complaint filed by Defendant American Modern Insurance Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 4/16/2015 (H,JD).
April 10, 2015 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Midland-Guardian Co., Corporate Parent The Midland Company, Corporate Parent Munich American Holding Corp. for American Modern Insurance Group, Inc. filed by American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark)
April 10, 2015 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Trischa Snyder Chapman filed by on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.. (Chapman, Trischa)
April 10, 2015 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Rodger L. Eckelberry filed by on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.. (Eckelberry, Rodger)
April 10, 2015 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Mark Alan Johnson filed by on behalf of American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark)
April 2, 2015 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (L,A)
April 2, 2015 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,A)
April 2, 2015 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. (L,A)
April 2, 2015 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (L,A)
April 2, 2015 Filing 2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Giles, Brian)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand Class Action against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7029335. Filed by Lynne Nofziger, Jeffrey Nofziger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I) (Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nofziger v. Huntington Bancshares Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Business Corporation
Represented By: David R. Hudson
Represented By: Andrew J. Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Trischa Snyder Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Keith A. Noreika
Represented By: James D. Curphey
Represented By: Tracey L. Turnbull
Represented By: Andrew J. Soukup
Represented By: Robert W. Trafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Bancshares Incorporated
Represented By: James D. Curphey
Represented By: Tracey L. Turnbull
Represented By: Robert W. Trafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Nofziger
Represented By: Joseph B. Russell
Represented By: Avonte D. Campinha-Bacote
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Represented By: Bryce A. Lenox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Nofziger
Represented By: Joseph B. Russell
Represented By: Avonte D. Campinha-Bacote
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Represented By: Bryce A. Lenox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?