Browning et al v. University of Findlay et al
Plaintiff: Justin Browning and Alphonso Baity, II
Defendant: University of Findlay, University of Findlay Board of Trustees, David M Emsweller, Brandi Laurita, Matthew Bruskotter, Rachel Walter, Ken Walerius, Brian Treece, Breanna Ervin Miller, M.K. and John and/or Jane Does #1-10
Case Number: 3:2015cv02687
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Hancock
Presiding Judge: James G. Carr
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order: Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Insurance Companys motion for summaryjudgment (Doc. 111) be, and the same hereby is, granted. Judge James G. Carr on 2/21/19.(C,D)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order: M.K.'s motion for prejudgment attachment (Doc. 115 ) be, and the same hereby is, denied.Judge James G. Carr on 2/13/19.(C,D)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Judgment Entry: In accordance with the order (Re: 109 ) filed contemporaneously with this judgment entry, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 68 ) be, and the same hereby is, granted. State Farm F ire and Casualty Company has no duty to defend or indemnify Alphonso Baity II against any of the claims asserted against him by counterclaimant M.K. There being no just reason for delay, this order is a final and appealable order under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). Judge James G. Carr on 11/14/18. (re ( 97 68 96 )Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-02687-JGC, 3:18-cv-01097-JGC(C,D)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Order: Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Insurance Company's motion for a determination that Michigan law applies to any coverage determination under the Allstate Policy (Doc. 95) is granted. Judge James G. Carr on 10/11/18.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-02687-JGC, 3:18-cv-01097-JGC(C,D)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order: State Farm's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 68 )is granted. Judge James G. Carr on 9/5/18. (C,D)
July 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order: Regarding FERPA Production (re 28 ). Judge James G. Carr on 7/30/16. (C,D)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order: All counts against defendant Brian Treece be, and the same hereby are, dismissed with prejudice. Counts I, III, V, VI, and XI against defendants David W. Emsweller, Brandi Laurita, Matthew Bruskotter, Rachel Walter, Ken Walerius, and B reanna Ervin Miller be, and the same hereby are, dismissed with prejudice. Count X against all defendants be, and the same hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. The defendants' motion to dismiss the Board of Trustees of the University of Findlay and its individual board members as to all claims be, and the same hereby is, granted. Judge James G. Carr on 4/26/16. (C,D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browning et al v. University of Findlay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Browning
Represented By: Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr.
Represented By: Robert B. Graziano
Represented By: Michael R. Traven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Baity, II
Represented By: Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr.
Represented By: Robert B. Graziano
Represented By: Michael R. Traven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Findlay
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Findlay Board of Trustees
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Emsweller
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Laurita
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bruskotter
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Walter
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Walerius
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Treece
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breanna Ervin Miller
Represented By: K. Roger Schoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.K.
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?