Pelmear et al v. O'Connor et al
Plaintiff: Noah-Wade Pelmear and Douglas-Alan Pelmear
Defendant: Kenny Cowell, Reminger Co. LPA, Ed Leininger, Marsha Kolb, XYZ Corporations, Brian Banister, Alyese Stidham, Judge Christine E. Mayle, Shane Chamberlin, Thomas H. VonDeylen, Mayor Kathy Huner, Barber, Kaper, Stamm, McWatters & Whitlock, Harold Stickley, Nathan Slough, Judge James D. Jenson, Vaughn Bentz, Steve Schneider, Chief-Justice Maureen O'Connor, Gwen Howe-Gebers, Village of Archbold, Deputy John Trejo, Justice R. Patrick DeWine, Marc A. Fishel, Donna L. Keefe, Deputy Matthew Smithmyer, Mick Pocratsky, Justice Terrence O'Donnell, Stephen M. Maloney, Dennis Sullivan, Judge Arlene Singer, Glenn Miller, Michelle K. Schlade, Bob Hastedt, Justice Sharon L. Kennedy, Ryan Mack, John Jay Hanna, Tracy Zuver, Judge Joseph N. Schmenk, City of Wauseon, Justice Judi L. French, Judge Mark Powers, Jon Rupp, Thomas Albert McWatters, III, Scott Haselman, Deputy Jamie Simon, Defiance County Board of Commissioners, Michael P. Gilbride, Judge Eric K. Nagel, Maumee Valley Planning Organization, Vickie Glick, Michel Bodenbender, Brian Huffman, Mark D. Hagans, Matthew Davis, Marc Tanner, Judge Jeffery L. Robinson, Tony Imber, Gary L. Plotts, Correction Center of Northwest Ohio, Bill Rufenacht, Jon Rufenacht, Henry County Board of Commissioners, Roy E. Miller, Mike Mann, Heather Lumbrezer, Justice Mary DeGenaro, Randi Wudi, Whitney Lavinder, Judge Kent Lewis North, Dennis Miller, Kevin L. Morton, Jane and/or John Does, Connie L. Schnitkey, Kevin Eicher, Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht Downey LLP, Jeff Rupp, Justice Patrick F. Fischer, Scott Stiriz, Kevin Whitlock, Fulton County Board of Commissioners, CCNO and Jeff Stiriz
Case Number: 3:2018cv01480
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 33 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Granting the motion to withdraw Anthony P. McNamara as counsel for the appellees re #29 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 18-3915). Date issued by USCA 2/20/20 (H,SP)
February 7, 2020 Filing 32 Appeal Remark from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on February 1, 2020 and placed on the docket February 4, 2020 as No. 19-7542. (S,AN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 31 True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's judgment re #29 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 18-3915). Date issued by USCA 12/5/19, Costs: None (H,SP)
April 11, 2019 Remark: Manual filing 1-1, compact disc, shipped to Sixth Circuit Court Appeals, 100 East Fifth Street, Room 540, Cincinnati, OH 45202 via UPS. Related document(s) #1 . (R,Ke)
October 3, 2018 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #29 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 18-3915). Date filed in USCA 9/26/18. (H,SP)
September 24, 2018 USCA Appeal Fees received $505.00 receipt number 34660010927 re #29 Notice of Appeal received from Douglas Pelmear on 9/24/2018. (D,TM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #27 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #28 Judgment Entry of 9/11/18, filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear and Noah-Wade Pelmear. Filing fee paid 9/24/18, receipt #34660010927. Appellant instructed to file IFP application with the Circuit. (S,JM)
September 11, 2018 Copy of #27 Memorandum Opinion and #28 Judgment mailed to plaintiff's at P.O. Box 165 403 Hill Street Napoleon, OH 4354 on 9/11/2018. Related document(s) #27 , #28 . (S,AL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 28 Judgment Entry: In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum of Opinion and Order, this action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. re #27 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/11/2018. (S,AL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 27 Memorandum Opinion: Plaintiffs' Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis are granted, #2 #3 , and their Complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). I further dismiss Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Sanctions #4 #5 . Further, the following motions are dismissed as moot: Doc's #7 #8 #9 #10 #11 #13 #14 #15 #16 #17 #22 #25 #26 . I certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. This case is closed. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/11/2018. (S,AL)
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 Motion for Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in contempt of Court and Affirmation filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54: Summonses)(D,TM)
September 4, 2018 Filing 25 Third Motion for sanctions and Affirmation filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 53: Correspondence from Donald Theis dated 8/24/2018. #2 USM-285)(M,L)
August 31, 2018 Filing 22 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by James D. Jenson, Christine E. Mayle, Arlene Singer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summonses to Jensen, Mayle and Singer)(Carwile, Tiffany)
August 31, 2018 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance of lead counsel by Tiffany L. Carwile filed by on behalf of James D. Jenson, Christine E. Mayle, Arlene Singer. (Carwile, Tiffany) Modified text on 9/12/2018 (M,L).
August 30, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Service by personal service (unsigned) upon Ryan Mack, Gary L. Plotts, Mick Pocratsky, filed on behalf of Noah-Wade Pelmear, Douglas-Alan Pelmear. Related document(s) #1 . (M,L)
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Service Refused by attempted personal service upon Vickie Glick, Bob Hastedt, Marsha Kolb, Stephen M. Maloney, Dennis Miller, Glenn Miller, Jamie Simon, Thomas H. VonDeylen, Kevin Whitlock, filed on behalf of Noah-Wade Pelmear, Douglas-Alan Pelmear. Related document(s) #1 . (M,L)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Service by personal service upon Brian Banister, Barber, Kaper, Stamm, McWatters & Whitlock, Michel Bodenbender, City of Wauseon, Correction Center of Northwest Ohio, Matthew Davis, Defiance County Board of Commissioners, Marc A. Fishel (certified mail), Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht Downey LLP (certified mail), Fulton County Board of Commissioners, Mark D. Hagans, John Jay Hanna, Scott Haselman, Henry County Board of Commissioners, Gwen Howe-Gebers, Kathy Huner, Tony Imber, James D. Jenson, Heather Lumbrezer, Maumee Valley Planning Organization, Christine E. Mayle, Thomas Albert McWatters, III, Roy E. Miller, Eric K. Nagel, Kent Lewis North, Mark Powers, Jeffery L. Robinson, Bill Rufenacht, Jon Rufenacht, Jeff Rupp, Jon Rupp, Joseph N. Schmenk, Connie L. Schnitkey, Arlene Singer, Nathan Slough, Matthew Smithmyer, Dennis Sullivan, Marc Tanner, John Trejo, Village of Archbold, Tracy Zuver, filed on behalf of Noah-Wade Pelmear, Douglas-Alan Pelmear. Related document(s) #1 . (M,L)
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 Response to #15 Motion for extension of time to answer filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52-Unissued Summons, #2 USM-285)(M,L)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 Amended Motion for extension of time until 45 - days from the date of service of the Summons and Complaint by U.S. Marshal to answer Complaint filed by Barber, Kaper, Stamm, McWatters & Whitlock, Shane Chamberlin, City of Wauseon, Kathy Huner, Tony Imber, Stephen M. Maloney, Thomas Albert McWatters, III, Steve Schneider, Harold Stickley, Jeff Stiriz, Scott Stiriz, Marc Tanner, Kevin Whitlock. Related document(s) #2 , #3 , #8 , #1 , #9 . (Nicholas, Christina) Modified text on 9/12/2018 (M,L).
August 29, 2018 Filing 18 Response to #11 Motion for extension of time until 45-days from the date of service of the Summons and Complaint by U.S. Marshal to file response/reply to #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #8 , and Response to #10 Motion for extension of time until 45-days from the date of service of the Summons and Complaint by U.S. Marshal to file response/reply to #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #8 filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(M,L)
August 29, 2018 Filing 16 Amended Motion for extension of time until 45-days from the date of service of the Summons and Complaint by U.S. Marshal to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Vaughn Bentz, Kenny Cowell, Kevin Eicher, Mark D. Hagans, Brian Huffman, Ed Leininger, Kevin L. Morton, Nathan Slough, Village of Archbold. Related document(s) #2 , #8 , #9 , #3 , #1 . (Nicholas, Christina)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint filed by Eric K. Nagel, Kent Lewis North, Jeffery L. Robinson, Joseph N. Schmenk. Related document(s) #11 , #10 , #8 , #9 . (McNamara, Anthony)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 Amended Motion for default judgment of the Ohio Supreme Court Justices filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51: Notice of Appearance of Counsel, #2 U.S. Marshal Forms)(D,TM)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 Motion for summary judgment of the Ohio Supreme Court Justices by Default filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51 Defendant's Notice of Appearance of Lead Counsel)(M,L)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 Response (Acceptance of Defendants extension of time by conditions) to #8 Motion for extension of time until October 8, 2018 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(M,L) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (M,L).
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until 45-days from the date of service of the Summons and Complaint by U.S. Marshal to respond to #1 Complaint filed by Barber, Kaper, Stamm, McWatters & Whitlock, Shane Chamberlin, City of Wauseon, Kathy Huner, Tony Imber, Stephen M. Maloney, Thomas Albert McWatters, III, Steve Schneider, Harold Stickley, Scott Stiriz, Marc Tanner, Kevin Whitlock, Jeff Stiriz. Related document(s) #2 , #3 , #8 , #9 . (Nicholas, Christina) Modified event, text, and links on 9/11/2018 (M,L).
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for extension of time until 45-days from the date of service of the Summons and Complaint by U.S. Marshal to respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint filed by Mark D. Hagans, Nathan Slough, Village of Archbold. Related document(s) #2 , #3 , #8 , #9 . (Nicholas, Christina) Modified event, text, and links on 9/11/2018 (M,L).
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 Motion and Memorandum for extension of time for 45 days to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Correction Center of Northwest Ohio, Defiance County Board of Commissioners, Fulton County Board of Commissioners, Henry County Board of Commissioners, Maumee Valley Planning Organization. (Theis, Donald) Modified text on 9/5/2018 (M,L).
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 Motion for extension of time for 45 days to answer Plaintiff's Complaint by the following Defendants named in their official and individual capacity filed by Brian Banister, Michel Bodenbender, Matthew Davis, Vickie Glick, John Jay Hanna, Scott Haselman, Bob Hastedt, Gwen Howe-Gebers, Marsha Kolb, Whitney Lavinder, Heather Lumbrezer, Ryan Mack, Mike Mann, Dennis Miller, Glenn Miller, Roy E. Miller, Gary L. Plotts, Mick Pocratsky, Mark Powers, Bill Rufenacht, Jon Rufenacht, Jeff Rupp, Jon Rupp, Connie L. Schnitkey, Jamie Simon, Matthew Smithmyer, Alyese Stidham, Dennis Sullivan, John Trejo, Thomas H. VonDeylen, Randi Wudi, Tracy Zuver. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support with Exhibits)(Theis, Donald) Modified text on 9/5/2018 (M,L).
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 Second Motion for sanctions and Affirmation filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 Fulton County Receipts)(D,TM)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Nicole M. Koppitch filed by on behalf of Mary DeGenaro, R. Patrick DeWine, Patrick F. Fischer, Judi L. French, Sharon L. Kennedy, Maureen O'Connor, Terrence O'Donnell. (Koppitch, Nicole)
July 9, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for sanctions filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 49 - Silgan letter dated 7/3/2018)(M,L)
June 29, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for emergency preliminary injunction, and Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Douglas-Alan Pelmear, Noah-Wade Pelmear. (R,Ke)
June 29, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
June 29, 2018 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (R,Ke)
June 29, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Noah-Wade Pelmear. (R,Ke)
June 29, 2018 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Douglas-Alan Pelmear. (R,Ke)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Noah-Wade Pelmear, Douglas-Alan Pelmear. (Attachments: #1 Notice of manual filing and Exhibit list, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285) (R,Ke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelmear et al v. O'Connor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Cowell
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reminger Co. LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Leininger
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Kolb
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Banister
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyese Stidham
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Christine E. Mayle
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Chamberlin
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. VonDeylen
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Kathy Huner
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barber, Kaper, Stamm, McWatters & Whitlock
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Stickley
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Slough
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge James D. Jenson
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn Bentz
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Schneider
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief-Justice Maureen O'Connor
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Howe-Gebers
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Archbold
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Trejo
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice R. Patrick DeWine
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A. Fishel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna L. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Matthew Smithmyer
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Pocratsky
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Terrence O'Donnell
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Maloney
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Sullivan
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Arlene Singer
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Miller
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle K. Schlade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Hastedt
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Sharon L. Kennedy
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Mack
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jay Hanna
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Zuver
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joseph N. Schmenk
Represented By: Anthony P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wauseon
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Judi L. French
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mark Powers
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Rupp
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Albert McWatters, III
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Haselman
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jamie Simon
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defiance County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Eric K. Nagel
Represented By: Anthony P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maumee Valley Planning Organization
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Glick
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Bodenbender
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Huffman
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Hagans
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Davis
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Tanner
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Jeffery L. Robinson
Represented By: Anthony P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Imber
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Plotts
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Center of Northwest Ohio
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Rufenacht
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Rufenacht
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy E. Miller
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Mann
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Lumbrezer
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Mary DeGenaro
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randi Wudi
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Lavinder
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Kent Lewis North
Represented By: Anthony P. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Miller
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin L. Morton
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie L. Schnitkey
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Eicher
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fishel Hass Kim Albrecht Downey LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rupp
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Patrick F. Fischer
Represented By: Nicole M. Koppitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stiriz
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Whitlock
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCNO
Represented By: Donald E. Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Stiriz
Represented By: Christina M. Nicholas
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah-Wade Pelmear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas-Alan Pelmear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?