Gilmore v. Blanketship, et al
Plaintiff: Sean Gilmore
Defendant: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution, Investigator Shuler, Mr. Turner, Sgt. Blanketship, Inspector Alexander and Sgt. Blankenship
Case Number: 3:2018cv01489
Filed: July 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Toledo Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Referring Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2018 Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 1:17-cv-00729. Electronic file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/2/2018. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (S,L)
July 2, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (km) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (S,L)
July 2, 2018 Copy of docket mailed to Sean Gilmore, 721-420, Northeast Ohio Correctional Center, 2240 Hubbard Road, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 7/2/2018. (S,L)
April 25, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION of Cure of Waiver of Defects filed by Defendant Blanketship. (Smith, Kenneth) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION of Cure of Waiver of Defects by Plaintiff Sean Gilmore. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Blanketship. Blanketship served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (jlw) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Defendant Blanketship. (Smith, Kenneth). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 3/22/2018 (sct). [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth E. Smith for Defendant Blanketship (Smith, Kenneth) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Blanketship and sent to the marshal for service. (jlw) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : It is hereby ORDERED that the United States Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons, the Order granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and this Order upon defendant Blanketship as directed by plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/13/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (ew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2018: #2 Envelope) (ew). [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Object to Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Sean Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Objection to Report and Recommendation, #2 Envelopes) (ew) Modified Event Type on 2/8/2018 (bjc). [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 9 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Accordingly, all claims in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. #5 ) are hereby DISMISSED with Prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 191 SA(b )( l ), with the exception of Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment failure to protect claim against defendant Sgt. Blanketship, which claim shall proceed. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/29/18. (jlm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a completed summons form and Unites States Marshal form so that service of process may be made in this case within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/2/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 Amended Complaint : IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT The complaint, as amended, be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1), with the exception of plaintiff's Eighth Amendment failure to protect claim against defendant Sgt. Blanketship. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/2/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified docket text on 1/3/2018 (eh). [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Sean Gilmore. (jlw) Modified on 12/1/2017 (eh). [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Inspector Alexander; Blanketship; Investigator Shuler; Mr. Turner; and Warden, Warren Correctional Institution filed by Sean Gilmore. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: within thirty (30) days of receipt of this order, plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a completed summons form and Unites States Marshal form so that service of process may be made in this case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/9/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
November 9, 2017 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Blanketship, filed by Sean Gilmore. (jlw) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis And ORDERING the Collection of the Full Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/9/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following documents were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet, Summonses, USM-285 forms) by Plaintiff Sean Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kpt) [Transferred from ohsd on 7/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Blanketship, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Blanketship
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspector Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Blankenship
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?