CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Association, Local Union No. 1768 and Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 3:2018cv02348
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order approving #13 Joint Status Report and Motion to stay Litigation. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/6/2018. (D,L)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 Joint Status Report and Motion to stay Litigation filed by Plaintiff CSX Transportation, Inc.. Related document(s) #10 . (Gavel, Benjamin)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 Marginal Entry Order granting #11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/06/2018 to answer filed by Defendant Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/5/2018.(D,L)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/06/2018 to answer filed by Defendant Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mando, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 11/2/18. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report by 12/3/18. Court anticipates counsel will advise Court by that time whether they have agreed upon an expedited arbitration procedure or whether they wish to place case on an Expedited Track with this Court. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/2/18. (S,Na)
October 24, 2018 NOTICE [non-document]. At the request of counsel, Initial Phone Status set for 10/24/18 is vacated and reset for 11/2/18 at 9:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. (S,Na)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Joseph D. Mando filed by on behalf of Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO. (Mando, Joseph)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr filed by on behalf of Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO. (Hoffman, Joseph)
October 19, 2018 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $400.00 refunded on 10/18/2018 for receipt #0647-8949238. (K,Ve)
October 18, 2018 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 10/24/18 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. No dispositive motions shall be filed before the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO on 10/16/2018, filed on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Gavel, Benjamin)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David S. Birnbaum for CSX Transportation, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for attorney David S. Birnbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8960219, filed by Plaintiff CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David S. Birnbaum, #2 Proposed Order)(Gavel, Benjamin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/10/2018. (M,L)
October 10, 2018 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
October 10, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
October 10, 2018 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
October 10, 2018 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate on-line payment. Receipt #: 0647-8949238, filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Gavel, Benjamin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc. filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Gavel, Benjamin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint to Compel Arbitration against International Longshoremen's Association, Local Union No. 1768. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8949238.. Filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 24, 2014 Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - June 28, 2018 Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - July 20, 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - July 30, 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - July 30, 2018 Arbitration Demand, #6 Exhibit 6 - August 3, 2018 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - August 6, 2018 Grievance, #8 Exhibit 8 - August 17, 2018 Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - August 31, 2018 Grievance Denial, #10 Exhibit 10 - September 25, 2018 Grievance Appeal, #11 Exhibit 11 - September 26, 2018 Letter, #12 Exhibit 12 - October 2, 2018 Grievance Appeal Denial, #13 Exhibit 13 - CSXT Labor Agreement 20ILA-019-16, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons) (Gavel, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Association, Local Union No. 1768
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1768, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Gavel
Represented By: David S. Birnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?