Plaza v. Lairson Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Noberto Plaza
Defendant: Paul R. Crawford and Lairson Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02434
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed upon Lairson Trucking LLC. Waiver issued 11/9/2018 filed by Lairson Trucking LLC. (Munger, Peter) Modified on 11/22/2018: Wrong event used. Text modified. (M,L).
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed upon Paul R. Crawford. Waiver issued 11/9/2018 filed by Paul R. Crawford. (Munger, Peter) Modified on 11/22/2018: Wrong event used. Text modified. (M,L).
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Paul R. Crawford. (Munger, Peter) Modified text on 11/27/2018 (M,L).
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Reliance on Jury Demand filed by Paul R. Crawford and Lairson Trucking, LLC. (Munger, Peter) Modified on 11/22/2018 (M,L).
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 Jurisdictional Statement as to Defendant Lairson Trucking, LLC filed by Noberto Plaza. (Michael, Leah)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order: Plaintiff shall file a jurisdictional statement on or before 11/8/2018 identifying the citizenship of defendant Lairson Trucking, LLCs members. (re #1 Complaint. Judge James G. Carr on 10/24/18. (C,D)
October 22, 2018 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,JM)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Paul R. Crawford, Lairson Trucking, LLC. (at 2 addresses: 61 Riverside Dr. Hamilton, OH and 99 North Riverside Road) (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM) Modified text on 11/18/2018 (M,L).
October 22, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (S,JM)
October 22, 2018 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (S,JM)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Supplement to Complaint, - Supplemental Summons - Paul R. Crawford, filed by Noberto Plaza. Related document(s) #1 . (Boyk, Charles)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint, - Supplemental Summons -Lairson Trucking at 99 North Riverside Road, Hamilton, Ohio address (#2), filed by Noberto Plaza. Related document(s) #1 . (Boyk, Charles) Modified to add address for clarification on 10/25/2018 (M,L).
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint, - Supplemental Summons -Lairson Trucking at 61 Riverside Drive, Hamilton, Ohio address(#1), filed by Noberto Plaza. Related document(s) #1 . (Boyk, Charles) Modified to add address for clarification on 10/25/2018 (M,L).
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Noberto Plaza. Related document(s) #1 . (Boyk, Charles)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8969680. Filed by Noberto Plaza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons -Lairson Trucking, LLC (#1), #3 Summons-Lairson Trucking, LLC (#2), #4 Summons - Paul R. Crawford) (Boyk, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaza v. Lairson Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Crawford
Represented By: Peter C. Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lairson Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Peter C. Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noberto Plaza
Represented By: Leah O. Michael
Represented By: Charles E. Boyk
Represented By: Michael A. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?