Payne v. Kistler Ford et al

Plaintiff: Kellie Payne
Defendant: Kistler Ford and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02451
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 01/16/2019 to file response/reply to #17 Partial Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum in Support, #6 Partial Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Partial) filed by Ford Motor Company, Kistler Ford. Related document(s) #17 , #6 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Conor)
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 Memorandum opposing Defendants' #17 Motion with supporting Memorandum to dismiss filed by Kellie Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Legal Notice-Address Change Form) (Portnoy, Michael)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order granting #23 the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until 12/21/18 to respond to the motion to dismiss. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/12/2018. (S,AL)
December 10, 2018 Filing 23 Motion with supporting Memorandum for a one week extension of time of 12/21/2018 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kellie Payne. Related document(s) #17 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion filed concurrently, Payne's motion for remand, (Doc. No. 3), and her motion to strike Ford's motion to dismiss, (Doc. No. 9), are denied. Payne shall file her memorandum in opposition to Ford's motion to dismiss, (Doc. No. 6), within 21 days of the entry of this memorandum opinion. re #21 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/26/2018. (S,AL)
November 26, 2018 Filing 21 Memorandum Opinion: Payne's motion for remand, (Doc. No. 3), and her motion to strike Ford's motion to dismiss, (Doc. No. 9), are denied. Payne shall file her memorandum in opposition to Ford's motion to dismiss, (Doc. No. 6), within 21 days of the entry of this memorandum opinion. re #9 #3 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/26/2018. (S,AL)
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance of Elizabeth B. Wright, Conor A. McLaughlin, and Brianna W. Stuart as counsel filed by on behalf of Kistler Ford. (McLaughlin, Conor)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 Marginal Entry Order granting motion to withdraw as attorney for defendant Kistler Ford. Attorney Peter C. Munger removed from case. (Related Doc #16 ) Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/20/2018.(S,AL)
November 19, 2018 Filing 18 Partial Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Kistler Ford. (Munger, Peter)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 Partial Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Kistler Ford. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Preliminary Approval Order-USDC, SDFL , #2 Exhibit 2-Final Order and Judgment-USDC, SDFL , #(3) Exhibit 3-Notice of Appeal, USDC, SDFL , #4 Exhibit 4- Appellant's Motion to Dismiss-USDC. SDFL , #5 Exhibit 5-Corrected Letter-US Court of Appeals , #6 Exhibit 6-Retail Buyer's Order )(Munger, Peter) Modified attachment descriptions on 11/19/2018 (D,TM).
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 Motion by Peter C. Munger to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Kistler Ford. (Munger, Peter)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 Opposition to #9 Motion with supporting memorandum to strike Ford's motion with supporting memorandum to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (McLaughlin, Conor)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 Reply in support of #7 Motion to strike Class Allegations in the Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (McLaughlin, Conor)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum opposing Ford's #7 Motion with supporting memorandum to strike class action allegation to filed by Kellie Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Legal Notice-USDC, SDFL , #2 Exhibit: Letter dated 8/23/18) (Portnoy, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 Marginal Entry Order granting defendant Kistler Ford's motion for an extension of time until 11/19/2018 to respond to the complaint. #5 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/2/2018.(S,AL)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 Reply to Ford's #10 Memorandum opposing Plaintiff's #3 Motion with supporting memorandum for remand filed by Kellie Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Legal Notice-USDC, SDFL, #2 Exhibit: Letter dated 8/23/18)(Portnoy, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 Opposition to #3 Motion to remand case filed by Ford Motor Company. (McLaughlin, Conor)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 Motion with supporting memorandum to strike Ford's motion with supporting memorandum to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint filed by Plaintiff Kellie Payne. Related document(s) #6 . (Portnoy, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Partial Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Ford Motor Company. (McLaughlin, Conor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to strike Class Allegations in the Complaint with Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Approval Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Final Order and Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Appeal, #4 Exhibit 4 - 11th Circuit Dismissal, #5 Exhibit 5 - 11th Circuit Mandate)(McLaughlin, Conor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Partial Motion to dismiss Counts I-VII of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Approval Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Final Order of Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Appeal, #4 Exhibit 4 - 11th Circuit Dismissal, #5 Exhibit 5 - 11th Circuit Mandate)(McLaughlin, Conor)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion to extend deadline to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint until 11/19/2018 filed by Defendant Kistler Ford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Munger, Peter)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
October 28, 2018 Filing 3 Motion with supporting memorandum in support to remand case filed by Plaintiff Kellie Payne. (Portnoy, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
October 24, 2018 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate China-Jiangling Motors Corporation, Other Affiliate Turkey-Ford Otomotiv Sanayi Anonim Sirketi for Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. (McLaughlin, Conor)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Court of Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-020183708-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8973133. Filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Class Action Pursuant to Rule 23 of the Ohio Rules of Civil Procedure with Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Engle Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wright, Elizabeth) Modified description on 10/24/2018 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Kistler Ford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kistler Ford
Represented By: Conor A. McLaughlin
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wright
Represented By: Peter C. Munger
Represented By: Brianna W. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Conor A. McLaughlin
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wright
Represented By: Brianna W. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Payne
Represented By: Michael D. Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?