Tucker v. Promedica Central Physicians, LLC

Plaintiff: DESIREE TUCKER
Defendant: PROMEDICA CENTRAL PHYSICIANS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02805
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Notice [non-document]of Initial Status Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JUDGECARR_CHAMBERS@OHND.USCOURTS.GOV prior to the date of conference. Related document(s) #1 . (C,EA)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Desiree Tucker. Promedica Central Physicians, LLC waiver sent on 12/5/2018, answer due 2/4/2019 filed on behalf of Desiree Tucker (Mansell, Gregory)
December 6, 2018 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
December 6, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
December 6, 2018 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Promedica Central Physicians, LLC Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9038880. Filed by Desiree Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mansell, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Promedica Central Physicians, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESIREE TUCKER
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMEDICA CENTRAL PHYSICIANS, LLC
Represented By: Meghan Anderson Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?