Jeter v. Bottling Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Kortney Jeter
Defendant: Bottling Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00117
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Dismissal Order. Counsel represent that this case has resolved. Settled and dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Any subsequent Dismissal with prejudice filed within 30 days shall supersede this Order. This Court also retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. The Initial Phone Status set for March 12, 2019 is vacated. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/11/2019. (D,L)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 3/12/19 at 9:15 AM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
February 21, 2019 Notice to Attorney Raymond A. Cowley. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #6 . (P,WL)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Kortney Jeter. Bottling Group, LLC waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019 filed on behalf of Kortney Jeter (Gibson, Bradley)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/16/2019. (D,TM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Angela J Gibson filed by on behalf of Kortney Jeter. (Gibson, Angela)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/16/2019. (D,TM) Modified (no document uploaded) on 1/17/2019 (D,TM).
January 16, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (D,TM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons issued or provided. (D,TM)
January 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
January 16, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (D,TM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Bottling Group, LLC. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9099276. Filed by Kortney Jeter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gibson, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeter v. Bottling Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kortney Jeter
Represented By: Angela J Gibson
Represented By: Bradley L. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bottling Group, LLC
Represented By: Raymond A. Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?