State of Ohio, ex rel, et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of Ohio, ex rel. Michael Dewine Ohio Attorney General
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP, 3M Company, Angus Fire Armour Corporation and Chemguard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00120
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order: Defendants 3M Company; Tyco Fire Products LP; Chemguard, Inc.; and, National Foam, Inc. #15 shall have to and including thirty (30) days after the entry of a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order covering this action (or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL) to file their respective responses to Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge James G. Carr on 3/13/19.(C,D)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Richard F. Bulger for 3M Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge James G. Carr on 3/4/19.(C,D)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Tyler D. Alfermann for 3M Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge James G. Carr on 3/4/19.(C,D)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 Second Joint Motion for extension of time for 30 days after JPML decision to answer filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order)(Ireland, D.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by 3M Company. (Corwin, Jonathan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Tyler D. Alfermann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9128192, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Corwin, Jonathan - /s by Richard D. Schuster)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Richard F. Bulger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9128162, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Corwin, Jonathan - /s by Richard D. Schuster)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Viola Vetter. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge James G. Carr on 2/1/19.(C,D)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Kyle J. McGee. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ). Judge James G. Carr on 2/1/19.(C,D)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Jay W. Eisenhofer. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #10 ). Judge James G. Carr on 2/1/19.(C,D)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel filed by 3M Company. (Corwin, Jonathan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Jay W. Eisenhofer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9122035, filed by Plaintiff State of Ohio, ex rel. Michael Dewine Ohio Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bodie, John)
January 30, 2019 Notice to Attorney Rosemary D. Welsh. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #5 . (P,WL)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed. Buckeye Fire Equipment Company waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019 filed on behalf of State of Ohio, ex rel., Michael Dewine Ohio Attorney General. (Bodie, John)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Kyle J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9110646, filed by Plaintiff State of Ohio, ex rel. Michael Dewine Ohio Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bodie, John)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Viola Vetter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 0647-9110533, filed by Plaintiff State of Ohio, ex rel. Michael Dewine Ohio Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bodie, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #5 Joint Motion for extension of time until 03/15/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (re #1 Notice of Removal) 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products' answer due 3/15/2019. Judge James G. Carr on 1/23/19.(C,D)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Motion for extension of time until 03/15/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum in Support filed by 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order)(Ireland, D.)
January 18, 2019 Notice to Attorney James S. Simon. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Removal in State Court filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ireland, D.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc. filed by Chemguard, Inc.. (Ireland, D.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Tyco Fire Products, LP filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Ireland, D.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Common Pleas Court, case number G-4801-CI-0201804752 with jury demand. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9100121. Filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Instructions for Service, #4 Exhibit D - Summons, #5 Exhibit E - Summons, #6 Exhibit F - Certified Green Card, #7 Exhibit G - Instructions to Clerk re Service, #8 Exhibit H - Summons, #9 Exhibit I - Certified Green Card, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Second Page of Civil Cover Sheet) (Ireland, D.) Modified on 1/17/2019 (D,TM).
January 17, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (D,TM)
January 17, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Chemguard, Inc., failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (D,TM)
January 17, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Ohio, ex rel, et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, LP
Represented By: D. Jeffrey Ireland
Represented By: Erin E. Rhinehart
Represented By: Callum S. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jonathan P. Corwin
Represented By: John J. Kulewicz
Represented By: Rosemary D. Welsh
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Tyler D. Alfermann
Represented By: Richard F. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: D. Jeffrey Ireland
Represented By: Erin E. Rhinehart
Represented By: Callum S. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio, ex rel. Michael Dewine Ohio Attorney General
Represented By: John F. Bodie
Represented By: James S. Simon
Represented By: Jay W. Eisenhofer
Represented By: Viola Vetter
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?