Langley v. Phillips Feed Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Langley
Defendant: Phillips Feed Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00408
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 Dismissal Order. Counsel represent that this case has resolved. Settled and dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Any subsequent Dismissal with prejudice, or setting forth specific settlement terms and conditions, filed within 30 days shall supersede this Order. This Court also retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/29/2019. (D,L)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Marginal Entry Order granting #6 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Derek A. Liska for Plaintiff Robert Langley. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Derek A. Liska to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 34660011237. Filed by Plaintiff Robert Langley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(M,L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Phillips Feed Service, Inc.. (Hearey, Bruce)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,TM)
February 27, 2019 Notice to Attorney Derek A. Liska. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/25/2019. (D,TM)
February 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
February 25, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (D,TM)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Phillips Feed Service, Inc.. (Hearey, Bruce)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Sandusky Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-cv-95 . Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9164666. Filed by Phillips Feed Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sandusky Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hearey, Bruce) Modified payment information on 2/25/2019 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langley v. Phillips Feed Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Feed Service, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce G. Hearey
Represented By: Corey N. Thrush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Langley
Represented By: Derek Liska
Represented By: Derek A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?