Semiletow v. Skylife Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Semiletow
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Skylife Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: David J Rohrbacher
Case Number: 3:2019cv01047
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 Return of Service by personal service executed upon David J Rohrbacher on 6/26/2019, filed on behalf of Skylife Company, Inc. Related document(s) #19 . (Boerst, Bruce)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 Third Party Summons issued to counsel for service upon David J Rohrbacher. (D,TM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 Praecipe for issuance of Third Party Summons upon David J. Rohrbacher filed by Skylife Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #17 . (Attachments: #1 Third Party Summons)(Safro, Michelle)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 Third party complaint against David J Rohrbacher. Filed by Skylife Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SkyLIFE Unanimous Shareholder Agreement, #2 Exhibit SkyLIFE corporate registration documents) (Safro, Michelle) Modified UNSIGNED-Filer notified on 6/14/2019 (D,TM)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE. Initial Phone Status held on 6/7/19. CMC set for 7/22/19 at 1:30 PM (EDT) at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. If a party intends to file a Motion to Dismiss, counsel should meet and confer pursuant to Civil Case Management Procedures #6 and provide Court, ahead of the CMC, with copies of their correspondence. Plaintiff's response to Counterclaims is suspended and will be set if necessary at the CMC. If the presence of a party or lead counsel will constitute undue hardship, call opposing counsel and Chambers at least one week prior to the conference to request participation by telephone and, if allowed, provide a phone number where counsel and client may be reached. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due three days before the CMC. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/11/19. (S,Na)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 Marginal Entry Order granting #14 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michelle Safro for Skylife Company, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 6/7/19 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Motion for attorney Michelle Safro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9343930, filed by Defendant Skylife Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate Of Good Standing)(Boerst, Bruce)
June 2, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Skylife Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #12 . (Boerst, Bruce) Modified text on 6/3/2019 (D,TM).
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand, Counterclaim against Alexander Semiletow filed by Skylife Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Unanimous Shareholder Agreement, #2 Exhibit Skylife-Corporate Disclosure-Delaware First State) (Boerst, Bruce)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Permitting to Withdraw of Attorney Joel Daniel as Counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney Joel Daniel terminated from case. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/30/2019. (D,L)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Order Permitting Withdrawal of Attorney Joel Daniel as Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Alexander Semiletow. Related document(s) #3 , #10 . (McKeon, Sheila)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order granting #3 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Joel B. Daniel for Alexander Semiletow. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct)(D,L)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Marginal Entry Order granting #2 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kent Maynard, Jr for Alexander Semiletow. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/28/2019.(D,L) (Attachment: #1 ACTL Code of Conduct) (D,L).
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Bruce W. Boerst, Jr filed by on behalf of Skylife Company, Inc.. (Boerst, Bruce)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Skylife Company, Inc. on 5/13/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Alexander Semiletow Related document(s) #4 , #5 , #3 , #2 , #6 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card & USPS Tracking Status)(McKeon, Sheila)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/10/2019. (M,L)
May 10, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Skylife Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
May 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
May 10, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Alexander Semiletow. Related document(s) #1 . (McKeon, Sheila)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Joel B. Daniel to Appear Pro Hac Vice with certificate of good standing Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9302015, filed by Plaintiff Alexander Semiletow. (McKeon, Sheila)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for attorney Kent Maynard, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice with certificate of good standing with certificate of good standing Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9301964, filed by Plaintiff Alexander Semiletow. (McKeon, Sheila)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against The Skylife Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9301809.. Filed by Alexander Semiletow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (McKeon, Sheila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Semiletow v. Skylife Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Semiletow
Represented By: Sheila A. McKeon
Represented By: Joel B. Daniel
Represented By: Kent Maynard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Skylife Company, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce W. Boerst, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle Safro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David J Rohrbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?