Cheyenne Partners, LLC v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cheyenne Partners and Cheyenne Partners, LLC
Defendant: American Technologies, Inc., Berkley Insurance Group, Inc., J.C. Penney and J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01093
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 8/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting)(S,AL)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Cheyenne Partners, LLC. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of Cheyenne Partners, LLC (Atsou, Komlavi) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (M,L).
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Cheyenne Partners, LLC. American Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of Cheyenne Partners, LLC (Atsou, Komlavi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Cheyenne Partners, LLC. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of Cheyenne Partners, LLC (Atsou, Komlavi) Document unsigned, refiled as docket entry #9 on 6/6/2019 (P,WL).
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Berkley Insurance Group, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Atsou, Komlavi)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cheyenne Partners, LLC. (Atsou, Komlavi)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Tyler G. Tarney filed by on behalf of American Technologies, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Tarney, Tyler)
May 16, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,Ke)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon American Technologies, Inc., Berkley Insurance Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
May 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
May 16, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (R,Ke)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., #2 Summons for American Technologies, Inc., #3 Summons to Berkley Insurance Group, Inc.)(DiPalma, Douglas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9310485.. Filed by Cheyenne Partners. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Service Agreement, #2 Invoice Summary, #3 Bond to Discharge Mechanic's Lien, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (DiPalma, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheyenne Partners, LLC v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Partners
Represented By: Douglas A. DiPalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Partners, LLC
Represented By: Douglas A. DiPalma
Represented By: Komlavi Atsou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?