Buck v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Aaron Buck and Aaron R. Buck
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01365
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Referring Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 6/14/2019; by FedEx upon Commissioner of Social Security on 6/18/2019 and upon U.S. Attorney General on 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of Aaron R. Buck. Related document(s) #7 . (O,K)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Judge's Initial Order issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,HR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,HR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 6/14/19. (S,HR)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 06/14/19.(S,HR)
June 13, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/13/2019. (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Aaron Buck. (Icove, Edward)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Aaron Buck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Justin Herdman, #3 Summons Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #4 Summons William Barr, #5 USM-285 Justin Herdman, #6 USM-285 Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #7 USM-285 William Barr) (Icove, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Buck
Represented By: Edward A. Icove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron R. Buck
Represented By: Edward A. Icove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?