Vondenhuevel v. Danone US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Vondenhuevel
Defendant: John Does #1-3, The Dannon Company, Inc., John Doe and Danone US, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01435
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JUDGECARR_CHAMBERS@OHND.USCOURTS.GOV prior to the date of conference. Related document(s) #1 . (C,EA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Danone US, LLC. (Kaldor, Chad)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Danone US, LLC answer due 7/18/2019. Judge James G. Carr on 6/28/19.(C,D)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 18, 2019 to answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Danone US, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Kaldor, Chad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Danone North America Public Benefit Corporation for Danone US, LLC filed by Danone US, LLC. (Kaldor, Chad)
June 21, 2019 FILING ERROR - Defendant party name corrected to reflect LLC. Notice by Clerk that Dannon Company, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke) Modified on 6/21/2019 (R,Ke).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,Ke)
June 21, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
June 21, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,Ke)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Auglaize County Common Pleas Court, case number 2019 CV 0060 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9376790.. Filed by Danone US, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint (Auglaize County Common Pleas Court), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaldor, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vondenhuevel v. Danone US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dannon Company, Inc.
Represented By: Chad J. Kaldor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danone US, LLC
Represented By: Chad J. Kaldor
Represented By: H. Barry Devon Collins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vondenhuevel
Represented By: Braden A. Blumenstiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?