Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd. v. Blaylock Marketing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: First 2 Market Products, LLC and Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Curtis Blaylock, Blaylock Marketing, LLC, Leslie Blaylock and Susanne Blaylock
Case Number: 3:2019cv01643
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 Motion for default judgment filed by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd., First 2 Market Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment Entry)(Strup, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 Application to Clerk for entry of default against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application, #2 Proposed Entry of Default)(Strup, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Susanne Blaylock on 7/25/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Leslie Blaylock on 7/25/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Blaylock Marketing, LLC on 7/25/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Blaylock Marketing, LLC on 7/19/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Curtis Blaylock on 7/19/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #1 . (Strup, David)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Plaintiffs' #2 Motion to Appoint Process Server. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/19/2019. (S,JM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by First 2 Market Products, LLC. (Strup, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd.. (Strup, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
July 19, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (M,L)
July 19, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Curtis Blaylock, Leslie Blaylock, Susanne Blaylock, Blaylock Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
July 19, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
July 19, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement - Civil Cover Sheet (county listed) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Strup, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Motion Appointing Process Server filed by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd., First 2 Market Products, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strup, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9425439.. Filed by Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd., First 2 Market Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Patent, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Photos, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Infringing Photos, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (Strup, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd. v. Blaylock Marketing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First 2 Market Products, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Dockins
Represented By: David P. Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dae Sung Hi Tech Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Michael E. Dockins
Represented By: David P. Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?