Fuller v. Randall Bearings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Fuller
Defendant: International Union Electronic, Electrical, Salaried, Machine and Furniture Workers-Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, Local 84742, Randall Bearings, Inc. and Local 84742 International Union Electronic, Electrical, Salaried, Machine and Furniture Workers-Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 3:2019cv01670
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion for extension of time to answer filed by Defendant Randall Bearings, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 , #8 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deller, Scott)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Rebecca E. Shope and Scott G. Deller, filed by on behalf of Randall Bearings, Inc.. (Shope, Rebecca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for more definite statement with memorandum in support filed by Defendant Local 84742 International Union Electronic, Electrical, Salaried, Machine and Furniture Workers-Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Whitten-Amadon, Casey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Randall Bearings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Michael Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Alias Summons))(Landry, Francis)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Michael Fuller. Local 84742 International Union Electronic, Electrical, Salaried, Machine and Furniture Workers-Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO waiver sent on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019 filed on behalf of Michael Fuller (Landry, Francis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons-Directed to Defendant IUE-CWA Local 84742 filed by Michael Fuller. (Landry, Francis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons-directed to Defendant Randall Bearings, Inc. filed by Michael Fuller. (Landry, Francis)
July 23, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (D,TM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons issued or provided. (D,TM)
July 23, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
July 23, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (D,TM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9430337.. Filed by Michael Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of portions of collective bargaining agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Randall Bearings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union Electronic, Electrical, Salaried, Machine and Furniture Workers-Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, Local 84742
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Bearings, Inc.
Represented By: Scott G. Deller
Represented By: Rebecca E. Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 84742 International Union Electronic, Electrical, Salaried, Machine and Furniture Workers-Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Casey Whitten-Amadon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fuller
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?