Sattler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Larry S. Sattler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01693
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order setting forth procedural schedule as it relates to the filing of briefs. Plaintiff's brief due by 10/21/19, defendant's brief due 11/20/19, plaintiff's reply, if any, due 12/4/19. Joint certification that meet and confer has been done due by 12/18/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 9/20/19. (D,Ky)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #9 . (Buck, Lynne)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Buck, Lynne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Attorney's Office on 7/25/2019, upon US Attorney General's Office via FedEx on 7/26/19, upon Office of Regional Chief Counsel via Fedex on 7/26/19 filed on behalf of Larry S. Sattler (Related document(s) #7 ). (H,SP)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (D,Ky)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 7/25/19. (D,Ky)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 7/25/19.(D,Ky)
July 25, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James G. Carr on 7/25/2019. (D,TM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/25/2019. (D,TM)
July 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.. (D,TM)
July 25, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (D,TM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Providing Information to US Attorney filed by Larry S. Sattler. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Larry S. Sattler. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Larry S. Sattler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM-285 Attorney General, #3 USM-285 US Attorney, #4 USM-285 Regional Counsel, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney, #7 Summons Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sattler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry S. Sattler
Represented By: Clifford M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?