Whiting v. Washington Township et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Michael Whiting
Defendant: Toledo Police Department, Washington Township, Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio and Lucas County Sheriff
Case Number: 3:2019cv01707
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Response to #4 Motion for more definite statement filed by Douglas Michael Whiting. (M,L) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #1 Response - file stamped) (M,L).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until 9/27/2019 to move, plead or answer #1 Complaint filed by Defendant Washington Township. (Choka, Byron)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for more definite statement filed by Lucas County Sheriff, Washington Township. (Lyle, Dennis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until September 27, 2019 to move, plead or answer to #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio. (Grigsby, Teresa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 Original Summons issued to Plaintiff for service upon Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,TM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid of $400.00. Receipt # 34660011446. Filed by Douglas Michael Whiting. (Attachments: #1 Photo of Property, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Address Sheet for Defendants, #4 Summonses, #5 U.S. Marshal Forms) (D,TM)
July 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
July 26, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (D,TM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whiting v. Washington Township et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toledo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Township
Represented By: Elaine Berendsen Szuch
Represented By: John A. Borell, Sr.
Represented By: Byron S. Choka
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Center of Northwest Ohio
Represented By: Teresa L. Grigsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas County Sheriff
Represented By: Elaine Berendsen Szuch
Represented By: John A. Borell, Sr.
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Michael Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?