Raglin v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Christopher Raglin
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01860
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 10/2/19. Case Management Conference to be held on 11/4/19 at 1:30 PM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Lead counsel and party attendance required. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due 3 days before the Conference. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/3/19. (S,Na)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Compete Agreement signed by Plaintiff)(Frantz, Monica)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 10/2/19 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Frantz, Monica)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Monica L. Frantz and Nancy A. Noall filed by on behalf of Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Frantz, Monica)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Christopher Raglin. (Landry, Francis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/15/2019. (M,L)
August 15, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
August 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
August 15, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9471824.. Filed by Christopher Raglin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raglin v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Monica L. Frantz
Represented By: Nancy A. Noall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Raglin
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?