Local 86, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, et al. v. Tenneco Automotive Operating Company, Inc./DRiV, Inc.
Plaintiff: UAW Local 86, UAW, Local 86, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America and International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Defendant: Tenneco Automotive Operating, Inc. and Pullman Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01869
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 11/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 210 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(S,AL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Pullman Company on 8/26/2019, filed on behalf of Local 86, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America; International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America (Torzewski, Joan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Pullman Company answer due 10/17/2019. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/17/2019.(S,AL)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Philip J. Gutwein II. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/17/2019.(S,AL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 10/17/2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Pullman Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolfla, Paul) Modified to correct party name on 9/17/2019 (R,Ke).
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tenneco Inc., Other Affiliate The Pullman Company for Tenneco Automotive Operating Company, Inc./DRiV, Inc. filed by Pullman Company. (Wolfla, Paul) Modified to correct party name on 9/17/2019 (R,Ke).
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Wolfla filed by on behalf of Pullman Company. (Wolfla, Paul) Modified to correct party name on 9/17/2019 (R,Ke).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Philip J. Gutwein II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 34660011511, filed by Defendant Tenneco Automotive Operating Company, Inc./DRiV, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration of Philip J. Gutwein II)(M,L)
August 16, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Tenneco Automotive Operating Company, Inc./DRiV, Inc. (individually and to statutory agent) (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
August 16, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Tenneco Automotive Operating, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9473364.. Filed by UAW, UAW Local 86. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A. CBA Article IX, #5 Exhibit B. CBA Article VI, #6 Exhibit C. Grievance, #7 Exhibit D. Grievance Answer) (Torzewski, Joan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 86, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, et al. v. Tenneco Automotive Operating Company, Inc./DRiV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UAW Local 86
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UAW
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 86, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Joan Torzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenneco Automotive Operating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pullman Company
Represented By: Philip J. Gutwein, II
Represented By: Paul A. Wolfla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?