Fresh Products Inc v. Impact Products, LLC
Plaintiff: Fresh Products, Inc.
Defendant: Impact Products, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02109
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Copy of #28 Magistrate Consent Form, and docket sheet mailed to Joseph Francis Jennings and Adam R Aquino at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP, 2040 Main Street, 14th Floor, Irvine, CA 92614; T Scott Vick, at Vick Law Group APC,800 West 6th Street, Suite 1220, Los Angeles, CA 90017; John L North, Martha L Decker, Steven G Hill, and Vivek Anand Ganti at Hill Kertscher and Wharton LLP, 3350 Riverwood Parkway, Suite 800, Atlanta, GA 30339 on 9/13/2019. (T,Je)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je)
September 13, 2019 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Fresh Products, Inc. is reminded of their obligation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (T,Je)
September 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (T,Je)
September 13, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (T,Je)
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 2:19-cv-05994. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Change Venue #24 , transferring case to Northern District of Ohio at Toledo. Case transferred electronically on 9/12/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for October 10, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than September 26, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Change Venue to Northern District of Ohio, Toledo Division filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC.(Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Martha L. Decker APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Impact Products LLC, designating Scott Vick as local counsel. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Martha L. Decker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Impact Products, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24250684) filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney John L. North APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Impact Products LLC, designating Scott Vick as local counsel. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Hill APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Impact Products LLC, designating Scott Vick as local counsel. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John L. North to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Impact Products, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24196609) filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Impact Products, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24196473) filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney T Scott Vick counsel for Defendant Impact Products, LLC. Adding Vivek Ganti as counsel of record for Impact Products, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC. (Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC, identifying S.P. Richards Co.. (Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Impact Products, LLC answer now due 9/4/2019, filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC.(Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney T Scott Vick counsel for Defendant Impact Products, LLC. Adding Scott Vick as counsel of record for Impact Products, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Impact Products, LLC. (Attorney T Scott Vick added to party Impact Products, LLC(pty:dft))(Vick, T) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-05994 GW(AFMx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05994 DSF(AFMx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Impact Products, LLC. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Fresh Products Inc. (Jennings, Joseph) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fresh Products Inc, (Jennings, Joseph) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fresh Products Inc. (Jennings, Joseph) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fresh Products Inc. (Jennings, Joseph) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24069768 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Fresh Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Joseph Francis Jennings added to party Fresh Products Inc(pty:pla))(Jennings, Joseph) [Transferred from cacd on 9/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresh Products Inc v. Impact Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresh Products, Inc.
Represented By: Adam R Aquino
Represented By: Joseph Francis Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Products, LLC
Represented By: John L North
Represented By: Vivek Anand Ganti
Represented By: Steven G Hill
Represented By: Martha L Decker
Represented By: T Scott Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?