Calderas v. AK Tube, LLC
Plaintiff: Carlos Calderas
Defendant: AK Tube, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02431
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 12/6/19. Defendant's Motion to extend time to answer the Complaint (Doc. #10 ) is granted with a further extension until 1/24/20. Counsel shall use the time between now and then to continue discussions and exchange documents. Counsel shall advise Court prior to 1/24/20 if a resolution is reached; if not, counsel shall jointly call Chambers by 1/24/20 to schedule a Case Management Conference. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/6/19. (S,Na)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Agreed Order (Motion for an extension of time to answer, move, or plead to Plaintiff's Complaint until 1/20/20 filed by Defendant AK Tube, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie) Modified text on 12/8/2019 (D,TM).
November 26, 2019 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 12/6/19 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Consent to Join Form of Opt-In Plaintiff filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join as Opt-In Plaintiff)(Bryant, Daniel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson filed by on behalf of AK Tube, LLC. (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Ryan M. Martin filed by on behalf of AK Tube, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join - Scruggs)(Coffman, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Consent Form to Join in Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(Coffman, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Carlos Calderas. AK Tube, LLC waiver sent on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 filed on behalf of Carlos Calderas (Coffman, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/18/2019. (D,TM)
October 18, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (D,TM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (D,TM)
October 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
October 18, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (D,TM)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 Collective and Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act and Ohio Law with jury demand against AK Tube, LLC. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9580672.. Filed by Carlos Calderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Calderas Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B - February 6 - February 12, 2017 Pay Stub, #3 Exhibit C - April 9 - April 15, 2018 Pay Stub, #4 Exhibit D - February 13 - February 19, 2017 Pay Stub, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderas v. AK Tube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK Tube, LLC
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Represented By: Ryan M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Calderas
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Represented By: Daniel I. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?