Davis v. United States Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Davis
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc., United States Department of Education and Secretary of the United States Department of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv02749
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Secretary of the United States Department of Education, United States Department of Education. Related document(s) #1 . (Rojas, Guillermo)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Coast Professional, Inc. answer due 1/21/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 12/26/19.(C,D)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 20, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Coast Professional, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] of Status Conference held on 12/17/19. Time: 30 Minutes. Further Status Report due by 1/31/2020. Status report(s) shall include, if needed, a request for further telephonic status conference. Judge James G. Carr on 12/17/19. (C,D)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Coast Professional, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Coast Professional, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Andrew E. Cunningham filed by on behalf of Coast Professional, Inc.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by James K. Schultz filed by on behalf of Coast Professional, Inc.. (Schultz, James)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order(Related Doc #2 ). Judge James G. Carr on 12/3/19.(C,D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Order filed by Leslie Davis. Related document #2 . (Jechura, Tyler)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] of Status Conference held on 11/26/19. Time: 30 Minutes. Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. #2 ) be, and the same hereby is, granted. Leave granted to plaintiff's counsel to prepare a proposed order and submit such order for review to the U.S. Attorney's Office. If any disputes arise as to the terms of the order, the parties shall notify the court forthwith. Upon submission of such order to the clerk of court, the clerk shall endorse the order and file it on the docket. Further telephonic status/scheduling order set for December 17, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call. Judge James G. Carr on 11/26/19. (C,D)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] of Status Conference held on 11/25/19 Time: 15 Minutes. Telephonic ex parte hearing re. plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order held November 25, 2019. Hearing to continue at 10:00 a.m. on November 26, 2019, at which time an attorney for the federal government shall appear. Judge James G. Carr on 11/25/19. (C,D)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Guillermo J. Rojas filed by on behalf of Secretary of the United States Department of Education, United States Department of Education. (Rojas, Guillermo)
November 22, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The Court will initiate the call.Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (C,D)
November 22, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (D,TM)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants to include United States Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,TM)
November 21, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM)
November 21, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (D,TM)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Leslie Davis. (Jechura, Tyler)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief with Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Leslie Davis. (Jechura, Tyler)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9641414.. Filed by Leslie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Jechura, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Davis
Represented By: Tyler N. Jechura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Cunningham
Represented By: James K. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Guillermo J. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the United States Department of Education
Represented By: Guillermo J. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?