Tellis v. Shuman
Plaintiff: Christopher Tellis
Defendant: Andrew Robert Shuman
Case Number: 3:2020cv00179
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 00 U.S.C. ยง 0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Prisoner, Supplement to #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Christopher Tellis. Related document(s) #3 . (Attachments: #1 Inmate Demand Statement, #2 Envelope)(K,AR) Modified text on 3/5/2020 (R,Ke).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order. Plaintiff is a prisoner in a correctional institution, therefore, he must pay the filing fee in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). If funds to pay the fee exist in his prisoner account, Plaintiff is ordered to pay the full filing fee of $400.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff does not have the funds in his prisoner account to pay the full filing fee, he is ordered to complete and submit the entire Financial Application accompanying this Order, including a certified account statement from the correctional institution, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice for want of prosecution. See Order for further detail. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Financial Application) Related document #2 . (S,JM)
February 5, 2020 Copy of #3 mailed to Christopher Tellis, #759307, North Central Correctional Complex, P.O. Box 1812, Marion, OH 43301 on 2/5/2020. (S,JM)
January 28, 2020 Copy of #1 Complaint mailed to Christopher Tellis #759307 at North Central Correctional Complex, P.O. Box 1812, Marion, OH 43301 on 1/28/2020. Related document(s) #1 . (M,L)
January 28, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
January 28, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Christopher Tellis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(M,L)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Andrew Robert Shuman. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Christopher Tellis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285, #4 Envelope) (M,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tellis v. Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Robert Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?