Michel v. ProAssurance Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Brenda Michel
Defendant: ProAssurance Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00261
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 Dismissal Order. Counsel represent that this case has resolved. Settled and dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs. Any subsequent Dismissal with prejudice filed within 45 days shall supersede this Order. This Court also retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/2/2020. (D,L)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document]. Court reviewed and approves the Joint Status Report (Doc. #14 ). Counsel shall advise this Court by 4/1/20 whether a settlement has been reached or whether Court should move forward and rule on the Motion to Remand (Doc. #9 ). Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/27/20. (S,Na)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Status Report filed by ProAssurance Insurance Company of America. (Faust, Laura)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 Reply in support of #9 Motion to remand case with the payment of just costs and actual expenses incurred as a result of the removal filed by Brenda Michel. (Murray, Florence)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Phone Status held on 3/18/20. Court discussed with counsel the pending Motion to Remand (Docs. #9 - #10 ). Before deciding the Motion, Court requested counsel pursue potential settlement. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report by 3/27/20 indicating whether progress has been made toward settlement or whether Court should proceed to rule on the pending Motion. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/18/20. (S,Na)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of William H. Bartle filed by Brenda Michel. (Murray, Florence)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 Opposition to #9 Motion to remand case with the payment of just costs and actual expenses incurred as a result of the removal filed by ProAssurance Insurance Company of America. (Faust, Laura)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE [non-document] of Phone Status set for 3/18/20 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. (S,Na)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to remand case with the payment of just costs and actual expenses incurred as a result of the removal filed by Plaintiff Brenda Michel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(Murray, Florence) Modified text on 3/10/2020 (M,L).
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR: Motion to remand case with the payment of just costs and actual expenses incurred as a result of the removal filed by Plaintiff Brenda Michel. (Murray, Florence) Modified text on 3/10/2020 (M,L). Modified on 3/10/2020: Incomplete document. Complete document filed as document #9 . (M,L).
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Status Report filed by Brenda Michel. (Murray, Florence)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 2/14/20. Counsel shall discuss the merits of a Motion to Remand by Plaintiff, a Motion for Judgment by Defendant, and potential settlement. Counsel should share legal support for or against remand and, if no agreement is reached, propose a briefing schedule. Joint Status Report due by 2/28/20. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/14/20. (S,Na)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 2/14/20 at 1:30 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ProAssurance Corporation, Corporate Parent PRA Professional Liability Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Podiatry Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate ProAssurance Insurance Company of America for ProAssurance Insurance Company of America filed by ProAssurance Insurance Company of America. (Faust, Laura)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/6/2020. (M,L)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
February 6, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
February 6, 2020 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Podiatry Insurance Company of America, ProAssurance Insurance Company of America. (Faust, Laura)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Erie County Common Pleas Court, case number 2017CV0128 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9769841. Filed by ProAssurance Insurance Company of America, Podiatry Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings from State Court action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Faust, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michel v. ProAssurance Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProAssurance Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Laura M. Faust
Represented By: Ronald B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Michel
Represented By: Florence Jesrani Murray
Represented By: William H. Bartle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?