Madia v. Elite Aerospace Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dalsukh Madia and Dr. Dalsukh Madia
Defendant: Zeeshawn Zia, Dustin Tillman and Elite Aerospace Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00593
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kelsey J. Mincheff for Plaintiff Dalsukh Madia. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge James G. Carr on 3/29/2020. (D,TM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Kelsey J. Mincheff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9882883, filed by Plaintiff Dalsukh Madia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Certficate of Good Standing)(Chmiel, Stephanie)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, Zeeshawn Zia. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
March 20, 2020 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,Ke)
March 20, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
March 20, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,Ke)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Amended complaint against Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, Zeeshawn Zia. Filed by Dalsukh Madia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Loan Guaranty, #3 Summons to Elite, #4 Summons to Tillman, #5 Summons to Zia) (Chmiel, Stephanie)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, Zeeshawn Zia. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9870955.. Filed by Dalsukh Madia. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Elite, #2 Summons to Tillman, #3 Summons to Zia, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chmiel, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madia v. Elite Aerospace Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalsukh Madia
Represented By: Stephanie M. Chmiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Dalsukh Madia
Represented By: Stephanie M. Chmiel
Represented By: Kelsey J. Mincheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeeshawn Zia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Aerospace Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?