Ringling v. Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juanita M. Ringling
Defendant: Fennert Larry, Ken Pratt Trucking Company, Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC, Edwin P. Hunter, Larry Fennert, Fennert Trucking, LLC and K & P Trucking, Inc. doing business as originally named as Ken Pratt Trucking Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01286
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. CMC held on 7/28/20. Case is assigned to the Standard Track with trial in AUGUST 2021. Counsel will discuss a Settlement/Mediation Conference after Plaintiff has completed recent medical evaluations and contact Chambers if help is needed. Deadline for amending pleadings/adding parties: 2/1/21. Counsel are reminded to follow the amended Civil Rules re proportional discovery and civility. Counsel will stage depositions pursuant to 2015 Civil Rules amendments. See Civil Case Management Procedures (Doc. #3 at Paragraph 3). Discovery deadlines: Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 3/1/21, with reports due by 3/30/21; Defendants' expert disclosures due by 3/30/21, with reports due by 4/30/21; Liability/Damages due by 5/15/21. Expert depositions and dispositive motions require prior Court approval. See attached Order for briefing requirements. Failure to follow will result in Clerk striking the briefing. Next Phone status: 11/9/20 at 9:00 AM. Counsel shall use the same District Court conference line. In the interim, counsel shall also revisit a consent to the Magistrate Judge. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/28/20. (S,Na)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. 26 filed by Larry Fennert, Fennert Trucking, LLC, Edwin P. Hunter, K & P Trucking, Inc.. (Beaubien, Sarah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Juanita M. Ringling. (Gervelis, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 First Initial Disclosures (Rule 26) filed by Juanita M. Ringling. (Gervelis, Mark- s/Michael D. Harlan) Modified signer on 7/8/2020 (R,Ke).
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE. Initial Phone Status held on 6/25/20. After discussion, in-person Case Management Conference to be held on 7/28/20 at 9:00 AM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel shall contact Chambers in advance to advise if counsel wish to attend by phone. Initial Disclosures shall be exchanged no later than 2 weeks prior to the CMC. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due 3 days before the CMC. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/25/20. (S,Na)
June 24, 2020 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 6/25/20 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. Defense counsel should also be prepared to discuss citizenship of the members of the LLC Defendant. (S,Na)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by K & P Trucking, Inc. (Beaubien, Sarah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fennert Trucking, LLC. (Beaubien, Sarah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Larry Fennert, Edwin P. Hunter, Ken Pratt Trucking Company, Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC. (Beaubien, Sarah)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/11/2020. (M,L)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
June 11, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
June 11, 2020 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Court of Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-020202090-000 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10035941. Filed by Edwin P. Hunter, Larry Fennert, Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC, Ken Pratt Trucking Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit A - Summons to Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC, #4 Exhibit A - Summons to Larry Fennert, #5 Exhibit A - Summons to Edwin P. Hunter, #6 Exhibit A - Summons to Ken Pratt Trucking Company, #7 Exhibit A - Certified mail to Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC, #8 Exhibit A - Certified mail to Larry Fennert, #9 Exhibit A - Certified mail to Edwin P. Hunter, #10 Exhibit A - Ken Pratt Truking Company) (Beaubien, Sarah) Modified party name on 6/12/2020 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringling v. Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fennert Larry
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Represented By: Sarah V. Beaubien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Pratt Trucking Company
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Represented By: Sarah V. Beaubien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Fennert Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Represented By: Sarah V. Beaubien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin P. Hunter
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Represented By: Sarah V. Beaubien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Fennert
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Represented By: Sarah V. Beaubien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fennert Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Represented By: Sarah V. Beaubien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & P Trucking, Inc. doing business as originally named as Ken Pratt Trucking Company
Represented By: Joseph W. Pappalardo
Represented By: Sarah V. Beaubien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita M. Ringling
Represented By: Mark S. Gervelis
Represented By: Michael D. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?