Marrow v. SSOE, Inc.
Plaintiff: John F. Marrow
Defendant: SSOE, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01471
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: case management conference to be held on 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Counsel to call the bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(S,AL)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by SSOE, Inc.. (Davis, R.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SSOE, Inc.. SSOE, Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020 filed on behalf of SSOE, Inc. (Davis, R.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance and Request for Notice by R. Ethan Davis and Joseph R. Torda filed by on behalf of SSOE, Inc.. (Davis, R.)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by John F. Marrow. (Luck, Amy)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
July 6, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
July 6, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
July 6, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against SSOE, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10083715.. Filed by John F. Marrow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit SSOE Stock Redemption Agreement, #3 Exhibit Cognovit Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit Marrow Notice of Intent to Resign, #5 Exhibit June 25, 2012 Email to Craig Bowie, #6 Exhibit July 2, 2012 Notice of Termination Date, #7 Exhibit Proposed Separation Agreement, #8 Exhibit Irrevocable Stock Power, #9 Exhibit October 25, 2012 Email from SSOE to Marrow, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luck, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marrow v. SSOE, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSOE, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Torda
Represented By: R. Ethan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Marrow
Represented By: Amy L.J. Luck
Represented By: Corey L. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?