Borgerson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian K. Borgerson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv01820
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by Certified Mail executed upon Commissioner of Social Security on 8/24/2020 filed on behalf of Brian K. Borgerson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit United States Attorney Certified Mail Receipt-initialed and marked C-19, #2 Exhibit Commissioner of Social Security Region V Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Exhibit US Attorney General Certified Mail Receipt)(Wilson, Laura) Modified service date on 9/3/2020 (M,L).
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 8/20/2020. (G,CA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Brian K. Borgerson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Commissioner of Social Security Summons, #2 Summons United States Attorney, #3 Summons US Attorney General)(Wilson, Laura)
August 17, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2.Judge James G. Carr on 8/17/2020. (M,L)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,L)
August 17, 2020 Remark by Clerk re Service Upon U.S. Government Defendant. If a U.S. Government agency or officer is sued, you must provide summons for that defendant, for the U.S. Attorney General (Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. 20530) and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio (801 West Superior Avenue, Suite 400, Cleveland, OH 44113-1852). (M,L)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L)
August 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,L)
August 17, 2020 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate Confirming Notification of Case Information filed by Brian K. Borgerson. (Wilson, Laura)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10188753.. Filed by Brian K Borgerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council Decision, #3 Exhibit Administrative Law Judge Decision) (Wilson, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borgerson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Borgerson
Represented By: Laura A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?