Orlandi v. Osborne et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Orlandi
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Andeavor Executive Severance and Change in Control Plan and Jonathan M. Osborne
Intervenor Defendant: Andeavor LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02237
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer Complaint filed by Andeavor Executive Severance and Change in Control Plan, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Jonathan M. Osborne. (North, Scott)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Andeavor LLC, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, and Marathon Petroleum Corporation answers due 12/1/2020. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/13/2020.(S,AL)
November 12, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Marathon Petroleum Corporation failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke)
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/01/2020 to answer Complaint filed by Andeavor Executive Severance and Change in Control Plan, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Jonathan M. Osborne. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(North, Scott)
November 11, 2020 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Scott E. North filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (North, Scott)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Marathon Petroleum Corporation on 10/21/2020, filed on behalf of Stacey Orlandi (Behrendt, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Marathon Petroleum Company LP on 10/21/2020, filed on behalf of Stacey Orlandi (Behrendt, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Andeavor LLC on 10/21/2020, filed on behalf of Stacey Orlandi (Behrendt, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Stacey Orlandi. Andeavor Executive Severance and Change in Control Plan waiver sent on 11/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021 filed on behalf of Stacey Orlandi (Behrendt, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Stacey Orlandi. Jonathan M. Osborne waiver sent on 11/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021 filed on behalf of Stacey Orlandi (Behrendt, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Theodore C. Anderson, III and Robert M. Behrendt for Stacey Orlandi. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ) (Related Doc #5 ) Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/15/2020.(S,AL)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Andeavor Executive Severance and Change in Control Plan, Andeavor LLC, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Jonathan M. Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Stacey Orlandi. (Johnson, Geoffrey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Robert M. Behrendt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10327866, filed by Plaintiff Stacey Orlandi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Geoffrey - s/ by Robert M. Behrendt)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Theodore Carl Anderson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10327834, filed by Plaintiff Stacey Orlandi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Geoffrey - s/ by Theodore C. Anderson)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Original Summons filed by Stacey Orlandi. (Johnson, Geoffrey) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (R,Ke).
October 6, 2020 Notice to Attorney Theodore C. Anderson. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
October 2, 2020 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons were issued none were provided. (K,AR)
October 2, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (K,AR)
October 2, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Andeavor Executive Severance and Change in Control Plan, Andeavor LLC, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Jonathan M. Osborne. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10315080.. Filed by Stacey Orlandi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Andeavor Plan dated 8/1/2017, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlandi v. Osborne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Andeavor LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Scott E. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Scott E. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Executive Severance and Change in Control Plan
Represented By: Scott E. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan M. Osborne
Represented By: Scott E. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Orlandi
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Theodore C. Anderson, III
Represented By: Robert M. Behrendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?