Kunos v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Kunos
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01130
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Case Management Conference (CMC) held on 7/26/21. Case is assigned to the Standard Track with trial in SEPTEMBER 2022. Counsel advise this case is set for a private mediation on 8/19/21. Deadline for amending pleadings/adding parties: 10/15/21. Counsel are reminded to follow the amended Civil Rules re proportional discovery and civility. Counsel will stage depositions pursuant to 2015 Civil Rules amendments. See Civil Case Management Procedures (Doc. #4 at Paragraph 3). Discovery deadlines: Plaintiff's expert disclosures, with reports, due by 1/15/22; Defendant's expert disclosures, with reports, due by 2/28/22; Liability/Damages due by 4/15/22. Expert depositions and dispositive motions require prior Court approval. See attached Order for briefing requirements. Failure to follow will result in Clerk striking the briefing. Counsel shall describe in the case caption whether a motion is "opposed" or "unopposed" -- which means counsel MUST confer with opposing counsel BEFORE filing any motion -- procedural or substantive. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report by 8/20/21 advising this Court if the case has resolved; if not, then Report due by 12/10/21. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/27/21. (S,Na)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Daniel E. Kunos. (Landry, John)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to counts II and III of the Complaint filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #7 Joint Motion to Drop Counts One, Four and Five from Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/28/2021.(D,L)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Motion to Drop Counts One, Four and Five from Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Defendant Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herring, Jacqueline)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE. Case Management Conference (CMC) to be held on 7/26/21 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel may participate by phone or Zoom, and party attendance is not required. Initial Disclosures shall be exchanged no later than 2 weeks prior to the CMC. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting shall be jointly signed and filed at least 3 days before the CMC. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/15/21. (S,Na)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 6/14/21. Counsel agree to continue exchanging initial disclosures; and meet and confer regarding the need for dispositive motion practice as to Count 4 (fraudulent misrepresentation) of the Complaint. Defendant shall file its Answer by 7/12/21. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/21 at 10:00 AM (EDT). Counsel may use the same District Court conference line if by phone, or the Zoom link provided by this Court. A CMC Notice will be filed simultaneously with this Order. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/15/21. (S,Na)
June 8, 2021 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 6/14/21 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na)
June 4, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/4/2021. (M,L)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline J. Herring filed by on behalf of Standard Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Wood County, Ohio, case number 2021CV0154 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10868766.. Filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Herring, Jacqueline)
June 4, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (M,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kunos v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Kunos
Represented By: John A. Landry
Represented By: John C. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?