Whitehouse v. Keystone Law LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cody Whitehouse
Defendant: Keystone Law LLC, Cassandra Blair Thomas and Cassandra Blair Thomas, Esq.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01135
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER [non-document]. Upon review of the docket in this case, all legal filings stayed until further Order to allow parties to discuss resolution. Dismissal or brief Joint Status Report due by 8/4/21. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/29/21. (S,Na)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Cody Whitehouse. Keystone Law LLC waiver sent on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; Cassandra Blair Thomas, Esq waiver sent on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Cody Whitehouse (Hyslip, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. (D,Ju)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Case Management Procedures Order, Judge Zouhary on 6/7/2021. (D,Ju)
June 7, 2021 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (D,Ju)
June 7, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (D,Ju)
June 7, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand for damages under the Fair Debt Collection Practices act, Ohio Consumber Sales Practices Act and other equitable relief against Keystone Law LLC, Cassandra Blair Thomas. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10869453. Filed by Cody Whitehouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Correspondence to Cody Whitehouse from Keystone Law LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hyslip, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehouse v. Keystone Law LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Law LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Blair Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Blair Thomas, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Whitehouse
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Hyslip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?