Jordan et al v. City of Toledo et al
Plaintiff: Mary Jordan and Jerome Williams
Defendant: Toledo Police Department, Ruby Sanibanez, Sergeant Joshua J. Bell, John Doe, Detective Nora Mugler, Chief of Toledo Police Department, City of Toledo, Detective Bill Noon and Sergeant Haney
Case Number: 3:2021cv01233
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing (Order on Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion) mailed to Mary Jordan, 2472 Lawrence, Toledo, OH 43620 and Jerome Williams, 516 Bancroft Street, Toledo, OH 43620 on 8/17/2021. (S,JM)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #9 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/17/2021 to file Response to Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/17/2021. (S,JM)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until September 17, 2021 to file response/reply to #7 Motion for expedited discovery filed by Joshua J. Bell, Chief of Toledo Police Department, City of Toledo, John Doe, Sergeant Haney, Nora Mugler, Bill Noon, Ruby Sanibanez, Toledo Police Department. Related document(s) #7 . (Green, Merritt)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Joshua J. Bell, Chief of Toledo Police Department, City of Toledo, Sergeant Haney, Nora Mugler, Bill Noon, Ruby Sanibanez, Toledo Police Department. (Charles, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for expedited discovery filed by Mary Jordan, Jerome Williams. (M,L)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Law Director Dale Emch on 7/6/2021, filed on behalf of Jerome Williams; Mary Jordan. Defendant not listed on Complaint. Related document(s) #3 . (S,DM)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon John Doe 2 stamped on 7/6/2021; Toledo Police Department stamped on 7/6/2021, filed on behalf of Jerome Williams; Mary Jordan Related document(s) #3 . (K,AR)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Joshua J. Bell on 7/2/2021; Chief of Toledo Police Department on 7/2/2021; John Doe 1 on 7/2/2021; Sergeant Haney on 7/2/2021; Nora Mugler on 7/2/2021; Bill Noon on 7/2/2021; Ruby Sanibanez on 7/2/2021, all signed and dates obtained from United States Postal Service website filed on behalf of Jerome Williams; Mary Jordan Related document(s) #3 . (K,AR)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Joshua J. Bell, Chief of Toledo Police Department, City of Toledo, John Doe 1 and 2, Sergeant Haney, Nora Mugler, Bill Noon, Ruby Sanibanez, Toledo Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
June 23, 2021 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (M,L)
June 23, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (M,L)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Supplement - Original signatures to #1 Complaint, filed by Mary Jordan, Jerome Williams. Related document(s) #1 . (M,L)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Joshua J. Bell, Chief of Toledo Police Department, City of Toledo, John Doe, Sergeant Haney, Nora Mugler, Bill Noon, Ruby Sanibanez. Filing fee paid. 34660012505. Receipt # 34660012505. Filed by Jerome Williams, Mary Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Search Warrant, #2 Search Warrant, #3 Inventory and Receipt for Property Seized, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 ERROR: Filed on wrong case. Summons) (M,L) Modified on 6/23/2021 (M,L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan et al v. City of Toledo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toledo Police Department
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Sanibanez
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Joshua J. Bell
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Nora Mugler
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Toledo Police Department
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Toledo
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Bill Noon
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Haney
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Merritt W. Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?