Wyandot, Inc. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Wyandot, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv01379
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by Certified Mail executed signed with C-19 upon United States of America on 7/26/2021 filed on behalf of Wyandot, Inc. (K,AR)
July 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to United States of America placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70201810000215285543. (H,JL)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (H,JL)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wyandot, Inc.. (Schuler, Robert)
July 20, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (H,JL)
July 20, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL)
July 20, 2021 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (H,JL)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against United States of America. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10939134.. Filed by Wyandot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015.02.27 Wyandot Letter to IRS, #2 Exhibit B - 2018.09.17 Wyandot Letter to IRS, #3 Exhibit C - 2019.02.19 IRS Letter to Wyandot, #4 Exhibit D - 2019.03.28 IRS Letter to Wyandot, #5 Exhibit E - 2019.08.14 IRS Letter to Wyandot, #6 Exhibit F - 2021.01.20 IRS Letter to US Rep Jordan Letter, #7 Exhibit G - 2021.04.19 IRS Letter to Wyandot, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons) (Schuler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyandot, Inc. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyandot, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Weber
Represented By: Robert G. Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?