Gillespie et al v. City of Toledo
Plaintiff: Paula Gillespie and Gerald Gillespie
Defendant: City of Toledo
Case Number: 3:2021cv01460
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance Leslie Kovacik by Jeffrey B. Charles filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Charles, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Paula Gillespie, Gerald Gillespie. City of Toledo waiver sent on 7/29/2021, answer due 9/27/2021 filed on behalf of Paula Gillespie; Gerald Gillespie (Harper, Matthew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Toledo. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
July 29, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against City of Toledo. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10955896.. Filed by Paula Gillespie, Gerald Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Permit, #2 Exhibit B - Notice, #3 Exhibit C - First Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Photographs of Headwall, #5 Exhibit E - Email of September 12, 2014, #6 Exhibit F - Email of September 19, 2014, #7 Exhibit G - Pictures of September 24, 2014 from City, #8 Exhibit H - Second Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Third Letter, #10 Exhibit J - Fourth Letter, #11 Exhibit K - Fifth Letter, #12 Exhibit L - Survey, #13 Exhibit M - Sixth Letter, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons) (Harper, Matthew)
July 28, 2021 Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (M,L)
July 28, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (M,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie et al v. City of Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Gillespie
Represented By: Charles E. Hatch, III
Represented By: Linde H. Webb
Represented By: Matthew D. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Gillespie
Represented By: Charles E. Hatch, III
Represented By: Linde H. Webb
Represented By: Matthew D. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Toledo
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Leslie A. Kovacik
Represented By: Rhonny L. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?