Saalim v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lutfi Said Saalim
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Board of Lucas County Commissioners, Michael J. Navarre, jeffrey bretzloff, Justyn Mcnett, John/Jane 1-5 Does, John/Jane 6-10 Does, John/Jane 11-15 Does, John 16-20 Does, Deputy Sheriff Jeffrey M. Bretzloff, Sheriff Michael J. Navarre, Jeff Bretzloff, John or Jane Doe Owners, Operators, Franchisees, and/or Subsidiaries, John/Jane Doe Lucas County Policy Makers, John or Jane Doe Contractor(s) and John or Jane Doe Employer(s)
Case Number: 3:2021cv01481
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Justyn Mcnett. (H,JL)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Alias Summons)(Walsh, Thomas)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walmart Inc.. (Asmus, Brittany)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 filed on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Asmus, Brittany)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Walmart Inc.. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 filed on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Asmus, Brittany)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Brittany Hicar Asmus filed by on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walmart Inc.. (Asmus, Brittany)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Kevin A. Pituch filed by on behalf of Board of Lucas County Commissioners, Jeffrey M. Bretzloff, Justyn Mcnett, Michael J. Navarre. (Pituch, Kevin)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lutfi Said Saalim. Board of Lucas County Commissioners waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 filed on behalf of Lutfi Said Saalim (Walsh, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lutfi Said Saalim. Michael J. Navarre waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 filed on behalf of Lutfi Said Saalim (Walsh, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lutfi Said Saalim. Justyn Mcnett waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 filed on behalf of Lutfi Said Saalim (Walsh, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lutfi Said Saalim. Jeffrey M. Bretzloff waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 filed on behalf of Lutfi Said Saalim (Walsh, Thomas)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Jeffrey M. Bretzloff, John or Jane Doe Employer(s), Justyn Mcnett. (M,L)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Justyn Mcnett. (M,L)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons of Justyn McNett, John Jane Doe 16-20, Jeffrey Bretzloff filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Walsh, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR: Supplement to Complaint - Summons John/Jane Doe 16-20, Justyn McNett and Jeffrey Bretzloff, filed by Lutfi Said Saalim. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 8/10/2021: Praecipe was not filed and incorrect form was uploaded. Praecipe to be filed and Alias Summons will be provided. (M,L).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint - Summons to Justyn McNett, filed by Lutfi Said Saalim. Related document(s) #1 . (Walsh, Thomas)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Board of Lucas County Commissioners, Jeffrey M. Bretzloff, John or Jane Doe Contractor(s) (x5-c/o Walmart Supercenter, Board of Lucas County Commissioners, Lucas County Sheriff's Office, CT Corp. System, and Corporation Trust Co., Corp) John or Jane Doe Employer(s)(x4-c/o Walmart Supercenter, Lucas County Sheriff's Office, CT Corp. System, and Corporation Trust Co., Corp) John/Jane Doe Lucas County Policy Makers (x2-c/o Board of Lucas County Commissioners and Lucas County Sheriff's Office), John or Jane Doe Owners, Operators, Franchisees, and/or Subsidiaries (x3-c/o Walmart Supercenter, CT Corp. System, and Corporation Trust Co., Corp), Michael J. Navarre, Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walmart Inc. Summons were not provided for Defendant Justyn McNett and were not issued. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Coversheet & Summons, filed by Lutfi Said Saalim. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Walsh, Thomas)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (M,L)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (M,L)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10958739. Filed by Lutfi Said Saalim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walsh, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saalim v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lutfi Said Saalim
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Walsh, II
Represented By: Hassanayn Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Brittany Hicar Asmus
Represented By: Taylor C. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Brittany Hicar Asmus
Represented By: Taylor C. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Lucas County Commissioners
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Navarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jeffrey bretzloff
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justyn Mcnett
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane 1-5 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane 6-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane 11-15 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 16-20 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Jeffrey M. Bretzloff
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Michael J. Navarre
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bretzloff
Represented By: Andrew K. Ranazzi
Represented By: Dennis A. Lyle
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe Owners, Operators, Franchisees, and/or Subsidiaries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Lucas County Policy Makers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe Contractor(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe Employer(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?