Stroh v. Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.
Plaintiff: Susan Stroh
Defendant: Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01683
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Notice [non-document] of Initial Status/Scheduling Conference reset for 11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM to be held by video conference (Toledo) before Judge James G. Carr. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants in advance of hearing. (D,TM)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.. (Yates, James)
October 25, 2021 Notice [non-document] of Initial Status/Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 11:00 AM to be held by video conference (Toledo) before Judge James G. Carr. Video conference access information to be provided to all participants three (3) days in advance of hearing. (SG,D)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.. (Pawlicki, Sarah)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 10/25/2021 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yates, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 10/25/2021 for Defendant to answer #1 Complaint. Judge James G. Carr on 9/22/2021. (D,TM)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Crown Battery Manufacturing Co. on 9/3/2021, filed on behalf of Susan Stroh (Widman, Marilyn)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Crown Battery Manufacturing Co. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (H,JL)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11008361.. Filed by Susan Stroh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Widman, Marilyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2021: #3 Corrected Complaint (text searchable)) (D,TM).
August 30, 2021 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (H,JL)
August 30, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL)
August 30, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (H,JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroh v. Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Stroh
Represented By: Clinton J. Wasserman
Represented By: Marilyn L. Widman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Battery Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: James B. Yates
Represented By: Sarah E. Pawlicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?