Kerr v. Pollex et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy L. Kerr
Defendant: Robert Pollex, Alan Mayberry, Matthew Reger, Paul Dobson, Thomas Matuszak, Aram Ohanian, Mark Wasylyshyn, Rod Smith, Cindy Hofner, Doris Herringshaw, Craig LaHote, Theodore Bowlus, Jane Spoerl and Matthew Oestreich
Case Number: 3:2021cv01750
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss all claims asserted against defendants filed by Alan Mayberry, Robert Pollex, Matthew Reger. (Stubbs, Matthew)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 Supplement to Motion to dismiss - Memorandum In Support of the Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, filed by Theodore Bowlus, Paul Dobson, Doris Herringshaw, Cindy Hofner, Craig LaHote, Thomas Matuszak, Matthew Oestreich, Aram Ohanian, Rod Smith, Jane Spoerl, Mark Wasylyshyn. Related document(s) #11 . (Sulek, Charles)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss filed by Theodore Bowlus, Paul Dobson, Doris Herringshaw, Cindy Hofner, Craig LaHote, Thomas Matuszak, Matthew Oestreich, Aram Ohanian, Rod Smith, Jane Spoerl, Mark Wasylyshyn. (Sulek, Charles)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/1/2021 to Answer as to defendant Alan Mayberry, Robert Pollex, and Matthew Reger. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/19/2021.(S,AL)
October 19, 2021 Copy of Order (Non-Document) on Motion for extension of time to answer mailed to Jeremy L. Kerr 686-150 North Central Correctional P.O. Box 1812 Marion, OH 43301 on 10/19/2021. (S,AL)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for extension of time until 11/1/2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Alan Mayberry, Robert Pollex, Matthew Reger. (Stubbs, Matthew)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Linda L. Woeber filed by on behalf of Alan Mayberry. (Woeber, Linda)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Linda L. Woeber filed by on behalf of Robert Pollex. (Woeber, Linda)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Linda L. Woeber filed by on behalf of Matthew Reger. (Woeber, Linda)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Matthew Elton Stubbs filed by on behalf of Matthew Reger. (Stubbs, Matthew)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Matthew Elton Stubbs filed by on behalf of Robert Pollex. (Stubbs, Matthew)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Matthew Elton Stubbs filed by on behalf of Alan Mayberry. (Stubbs, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by Jeremy Kerr upon Theodore Bowlus on 9/28/2021; Paul Dobson on 9/28/2021; Doris Herringshaw on 9/28/2021; Cindy Hofner on 9/28/2021; Craig LaHote on 9/28/2021; Thomas Matuszak on 9/28/2021; Alan Mayberry on 9/28/2021; Matthew Oestreich on 9/28/2021; Aram Ohanian on 9/28/2021; Robert Pollex on 9/28/2021; Matthew Reger on 9/28/2021; Rod Smith on 9/28/2021; Jane Spoerl on 9/28/2021; Mark Wasylyshyn on 9/28/2021, filed on behalf of Jeremy L. Kerr (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(K,AR)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Theodore Bowlus, Paul Dobson, Doris Herringshaw, Cindy Hofner, Craig LaHote, Thomas Matuszak, Alan Mayberry, Matthew Oestreich, Aram Ohanian, Robert Pollex, Matthew Reger, Rod Smith, Jane Spoerl and Mark Wasylyshyn. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,DM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Theodore Bowlus, Paul Dobson, Doris Herringshaw, Cindy Hofner, Craig LaHote, Thomas Matuszak, Alan Mayberry, Matthew Oestreich, Aram Ohanian, Robert Pollex, Matthew Reger, Rod Smith, Jane Spoerl, Mark Wasylyshyn. Filing fee paid. 402.00. Receipt #34660012653. Filed by Jeremy L. Kerr. (Attachments: #1 Indictment, #2 Bill of Particulars, #3 Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Envelope) (S,DM)
September 9, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)
September 9, 2021 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (S,DM)
September 9, 2021 Copy of #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, mailed to Jeremy L. Kerr #686-150 at North Central Correctional P.O. Box 1812 Marion, OH 43301 on 09/09/2021. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (S,DM)
September 9, 2021 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerr v. Pollex et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy L. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pollex
Represented By: Linda L. Woeber
Represented By: Matthew Elton Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Mayberry
Represented By: Linda L. Woeber
Represented By: Matthew Elton Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Reger
Represented By: Linda L. Woeber
Represented By: Matthew Elton Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dobson
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Matuszak
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aram Ohanian
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wasylyshyn
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Smith
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Hofner
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Herringshaw
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig LaHote
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Bowlus
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Spoerl
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Oestreich
Represented By: Charles E. Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?